Levy v. County of Alpine, et al.
Plaintiff: Robert E. Levy
Defendant: County of Alpine, Pamela Knorr, Tom Sweeney, Donald Jardine, Phillip Bennett and Nancy Thornburg
Case Number: 2:2013cv02643
Filed: December 20, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Alpine
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER signed by Judge Robert H. Whaley on 6/20/2017 DENYING 157 Motion for Attorney Fees. (Donati, J)
June 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER signed by Judge Robert H. Whaley on 6/12/2017 ORDERING Based on the review of the Bill of Costs, its supporting attachments, and the parties' briefing, the Court REDUCES the total amount requested by Defendantby $1,171.39 and DIRECTS the District Court Executive to tax $23,934.74 against Plaintiff. IT IS SO ORDERED The District Court Executive is directed to enter this Order. (Reader, L)
April 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER signed by Judge Robert H. Whaley on 4/25/17 ORDERING that the Motion for Directed Verdic pursuant to FRCP Rule 50 is GRANTED. IT IS SO ORDERED. The District Court Executive is directed to enter this Order and to enter JUDGMENT in favor of the Defendant.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
April 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER signed by Judge Robert H. Whaley on 4/14/2017 re: First Proposed Final Judge Instructions and Verdict Form. Any Objections will be addressed the morning of trial 4/17/2017. (Donati, J)
April 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER CORRECTING ERROR signed by Judge Robert H. Whaley on 4/13/17 ORDERING on 4/6/17, the Court issued an order on various pretrial matters. ECF No. 127 Among the matters discussed were Defendant's objections to Plaintiff's Designation of Deposition Transcripts in Lieu of Live Testimony. Id. at 4-5. In the Order, the Court overruled "the objections to [Kris] Hartnett's deposition testimony found at page/line 38:4-8..." Id. at 5. Following the issuance of the Order, c ounsel for both parties acknowledged that the wrong citation in Mr. Hartnett's deposition was cited. However the language was correctly identified, so the Court finds no harm occurred. The Court issues this Order and CORRECT the citation "page/line 38:4-8" to "page/line38:18-24" in ECF No. 127 . (Becknal, R)
April 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Robert H. Whaley on 4/6/2017 ORDERING The parties shall provide objections to these proposed jury instructions and their proposed revised versions of the instructions to the Court no later than 4/13/2017; Each party shall notify the other of the demonstrative aids and exhibits intended to be used in opening statements by 4/13/2017; the party wishing to use the demonstrative aid or exhibit shall contact the Court by 4/14/2017. (Washington, S)
April 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER re proposed jury instructions signed by Chief Judge Robert H. Whaley on 3/31/17. (Kaminski, H)
March 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Robert H. Whaley on 3/31/2017 ADDING the factual disputes requested by the defendant to the Central Factual Disputes section of the 64 Final Pretrial Order; ADDING the exhibits requested by the defendant to the 64 Fina l Pretrial Order; GRANTING IN PART, DENYING IN PART 68 Motions in Limine; GRANTING IN PART, DENYING IN PART 69 , 115 , 118 Motions in Limine; RESERVING RULING on the defendant's Motions in Limine 11 and 14; SETTING a Telephonic Hearing for 4/5/2017 at 02:00 PM in Visiting Judge (TBD) before Chief Judge Robert H. Whaley. (Michel, G.)
March 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER REAFFIRMING DEADLINES signed by Chief Judge Robert H. Whaley on 3/22/2017 ADOPTING the pretrial deadlines set forth in the 64 Final Pretrial Order. (Donati, J)
August 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 88 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 8/4/16 GRANTING the parties' request to CONTINUE the trial set for 8/15/16. The parties are directed to contact the Courtroom Deputy to confirm the first available new trial date.(Washington, S)
July 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 7/15/2016 DENYING 74 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney without prejudice to the submission of a proposed substitution of attorney if new counsel will be prepared to begin trial on 8/15/2016. (Michel, G.)
July 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 75 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 7/12/16: The court sets a telephonic hearing on defendant's motion to withdraw and request to continue trial (ECF No. 74) for July 15, 2016 at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 3 before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Plaintiff shall file an opposition to the motion, if any, no later than close of business on July 14, 2016. Any reply to the opposition will be addressed at the hearing. (Kaminski, H)
June 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 64 FINAL PRETRIAL ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 6/8/16. Each party is GRANTED 14 days from the date of this order to file objections to the same. If no objections are filed, the order will become final without further order of this court. The County's second and eighth motions in limine are denied. This order resolves ECF No. 45 , which is DENIED. (Kastilahn, A)
April 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 4/19/2016 ORDERING a Settlement Conference is set for 5/5/2016 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller; the parties are ORDERED to submit settlement conference statements by 12:00 PM on 4/28/2016. (Reader, L)
March 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 3/10/2016 ORDERING that 26 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED on all claims but the first, brought under 42 U.S.C. § 1983. The 39 supplemental declaration is STRICKEN. (Zignago, K.)
September 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 9/17/2015 ORDERING 21 The court APPROVES in concept the requested delay of expert discovery until resolution of any summary judgment motion, but DENIES the stipulated request without prejudice. Upon noticing and filing of a motion for summary judgment, the parties may request that the case schedule be stayed, with subsequent dates vacated pending resolution of the motion for summary judgment. (Reader, L)
November 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 11/21/2014 GRANTING defendants' 14 motion to compel; no later than 1/30/2015, plaintiff shall appear for his deposition on the date and at the place and time duly noticed by defendants; and the 12/17/2014 hearing date is VACATED. (Yin, K)
May 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STATUS (PRETRIAL SCHEDULING) ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 5/21/14 ORDERING that all Discovery shall be completed by 11/9/2015; Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 11/20/2015 with any rebuttal due by 12/11/2015, and all expert di scovery shall be completed by 1/11/2016; all dispositive motions shall be heard no later than 2/12/2016; the Final Pretrial Conference is set for 4/28/2016 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Judge Kimberly J. Mueller with a joint pretrial confe rence statement due by 4/7/2016; the Trial is set for 6/6/2016 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Judge Kimberly J. Mueller with trial briefs due by 5/23/2016. The parties estimate a trial length of approximately to 10 to 12 days. (Kastilahn, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Levy v. County of Alpine, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert E. Levy
Represented By: Douglas Edward Watts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Alpine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pamela Knorr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Sweeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Jardine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillip Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Thornburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?