Martin v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Lois Martin
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2013cv02671
Filed: December 30, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 06/06/16 granting 30 Motion for Attorney Fees. Plaintiff is awarded $5,830.85 in attorney fees under 28 U.S.C. § 2412(d); and Defendant shall determine whether plaintiffs EAJA attorn eys fees are subject to anyoffset permitted under the United States Department of the Treasurys Offset Program and, if thefees are not subject to an offset, shall honor plaintiffs assignment of EAJA fees and shall causethe payment of fees to be made directly to plaintiffs counsel pursuant to the assignment executedby plaintiff. (Plummer, M)
October 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 10/29/2015 DENYING 28 Motion to Alter or Amend the Judgment. (Michel, G.)
August 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 8/28/2015 ORDERING that Plaintiff's 15 motion for summary judgment is GRANTED. Defendant's 22 cross-motion for summary judgment is DENIED. The Commissioner's decision is REVERSED. This matter is REMANDED with instructions to award benefits. CASE CLOSED. (Zignago, K.)
February 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 2/27/2015 ORDERING the defendant to respond to the 15 Motion for Summary Judgment by 4/6/2015; MODIFYING the Court's Scheduling Order accordingly. (Michel, G.)
February 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATION and ORDER 17 for extension of time signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 2/3/2015. Defendant's time to respond to plaintiff's 15 Motion for Summary Judgment is EXTENDED to 3/6/2015. (Marciel, M)
January 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 1/5/2015 ORDERING that plaintiff's time to file a motion for summary judgment is EXTENDED to 1/6/2015. (Zignago, K.)
April 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 4/1/14 ORDERING that 3 Motion to Proceed IFP is GRANTED; The Clerk of the Court is directed to issue process and to serve upon plaintiff the undersigneds Scheduling Order and Order re Consent or Request for Reassignment for social security cases. The Clerk of the Court is further directed to serve a copy of this order upon the United States Marshal. (copy served on USM) (Dillon, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martin v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lois Martin
Represented By: Jesse S. Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?