Sparta Consulting, Inc. v. Copart, Inc.
Plaintiff: Sparta Consulting, Inc.
Defendant: Copart, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2014cv00046
Filed: January 8, 2014
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 525 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 10/3/18. Entry of judgment shall be STAYED until after the Court's ruling on post-trial Motions. The briefing and hearing schedule for the Parties' post- trial Motions is SET as follows: Opening briefs due 10/30/2018. Opposition brief due 12/7/2018. Reply briefs due 12/21/18. Hearing 1/11/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 523 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 09/10/18 ORDERING that Copart's professional negligence award is capped by ISA § 18 at $9,091,568.70. Copart is not entitled to restitution under unjust enrichment. Although Copa rt is entitled to restitution under either its fraudulent prong or unfair prong UCL claim of $6,332,350.77, Copart must elect to rely on the jury award or accept UCL restitution before entry of judgment. Sparta is entitled to prejudgment inte rest at a rate of 10% per annum beginning 12/26/16. Copart's trade secrets misappropriation claim is DISMISSED with prejudice. The parties are to meet and confer and submit, within 14 days: (1) a proposed briefing and hearing schedule for post-trial motion practice; and (2) notice of whether the parties have stipulated to a stay of entry of judgment or a stay of enforcement of judgment. (Benson, A.)
May 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 488 ORDER RE COMMUNICATION FROM COURT ABOUT JURY INSTRUCTIONS signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 5/21/18. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
April 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 398 PRELIMINARY JURY INSTRUCTIONS signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 4/24/18. (Kastilahn, A)
April 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 390 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 4/19/2018 DENYING Defendants' Motion to Bifurcate the Trial, ECF No. 290 ; DEFERRING a Ruling on Copart's Motion in Limine No. 1, ECF No. 273 , subject to Copart proposing a limitin g instruction; tentatively GRANTING Copart's Motion in Limine No. 2, ECF No. 274 , as provided by this order; DENYING Copart's Motion in Limine No. 3, ECF No. 275 , and directing Copart to propose a limiting instruction as provided by thi s order; DENYING Copart's Motion in Limine No. 4, ECF No. 276 , but allowing Copart to make specific objections; DENYING Copart's Motion in Limine No. 5, ECF No. 277 ; DENYING without prejudice to voir dire of the witness before the witne ss is called to testify, Copart's Motion in Limine No. 6, ECF No. 278 ; DENYING Copart's Motion in Limine No. 7, ECF No. 279 ; DENYING Copart's Motion in Limine No. 8, ECF No. 280 ; DENYING without prejudice to voir dire of the witn ess before the witness is called to testify, Defendants' Motion in Limine No. 1, ECF No. 266 ; DEFERRING a ruling on Defendants' Motion in Limine No. 2, ECF No. 267 , as provided by this order; DEFERRING a ruling on Defendants' Moti on in Limine No. 3, ECF No. 268 , as provided by this order; GRANTING Defendants' Motion in Limine No. 4, ECF No. 269 ; GRANTING Defendants' Motion in Limine No. 5, ECF No. 270 ; DENYING Defendants' Motion in Limine No. 6, ECF No. [ 271], as provided by this order; DENYING Defendants' Motion in Limine No. 7, ECF No. 272 ; GRANTING in PART Defendants' Motion in Limine No. 8, ECF No. 289 , as provided by this order; GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART Defendants' Motion in Limine No. 9, ECF No. 290 , as provided by this order. The court FURTHER ORDERS the parties to meet and confer to arrange the deposition of Gene Boyd for up to four hours in California, with plaintiff paying all costs and attorneys' fees associated with Mr. Boyd's deposition, and also regarding the relevant contracts, so that the parties can provide the court, by the first day of trial, a joint annotated version of the relevant contracts, or their competing versions, showing contract terms the parties request be construed either by the court or the jury. (Schultz, C)
March 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 365 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 3/26/18: 290 Motion to Bifurcate is DENIED with a further written order to follow. 266 Motion in Limine one is DENIED. 361 Ex Parte Application is GRANTED. Plaintiff to file an amended witness list by noon on March 30, 2018. (Kaminski, H)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 356 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 2/20/18 DENYING 265 Motion for Reconsideration. (Kaminski, H)
September 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 264 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 9/25/17, GRANTING IN PART, AND DENYING IN PART each Motion for Summary Judgment (ECF No. 184 , 185 , 186 and 187 ). (Kastilahn, A)
August 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 263 AMENDMENT TO THE SCHEDULING ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 8/14/2017 ORDERING the parties to file a joint pretrial conference statement by 10/27/2017; CONTINUING the Final Pretrial Conference to 11/17/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller; VACATING the Jury Trial and the deadline to submit trial briefs; ORDERING that no other portions of the 140 Amended Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Order be altered. (Michel, G.)
May 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 260 AMENDMENT TO THE SCHEDULING ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 5/12/2017 ORDERING the parties to file a Joint Final Pretrial Conference Statement by 9/1/2017; CONTINUING the Final Pretrial Conference to 9/22/2017 at 10:00 AM in Cou rtroom 3 (KJM) before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller; ORDERING that Trial Briefs be submitted by 10/30/2017; CONTINUING the Jury Trial to 11/13/2017 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller; ORDERING that no other portions of the operative 140 Amended Pretrial Scheduling Order be altered. (Michel, G.)
March 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 247 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 3/2/17 GRANTING Plaintiff/Counterdefendant Copart, Inc.'s Request to seal certain exhibits submitted in support of Copart Inc.'s opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
January 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 1/9/2017 DENYING 171 , 178 Ex Parte Applications without prejudice to renewal in limine or in another appropriate motion. (Michel, G.)
October 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 10/20/16 ORDERING that The motion to compel production of the back-up is DENIED without prejudice.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
September 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 9/29/16 ORDERING: the subpoena at issue directed to non-party SAP America, Inc. is QUASHED; Plaintiff is directed to serve a copy of this order on Andrew Whitney, counsel for non-party SAP America, Inc., and to file a proof of said service; Plaintiff's motion to compel further production of documents from custodians Narenda Singh, Tejas Shrishrimal, Rahul Bhardwaj, Srinivasa Sanapathi and Mandar Deshpande is DENIED; Plaintiff 9;s motion to compel documents relating to insurance claims is DENIED; Defendant's motion to compel production of documents is GRANTED. Responsive documents shall be produced no later than October 14, 2016; the motion to compel attendance at deposition in California of deponent Ajay Tiwari is DENIED; the deposition of non-party witness David Bauer shall take place no later than October 10, 2016. Said deposition may be conducted by telephone or other remote means. (Becknal, R)
September 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 9/20/2016 ACCORDINGLY the court DENIES Copart's sealing request. Defendants are directed to publicly file their opposition to the sealing request on the docket. (Reader, L)
August 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 8/31/2016 ORDERING that discovery in this matter is not governed by California Code of Civil Procedure. Plaintiff has sufficiently identified the trade secrets at issue. Responsive documents shall be produced within 30 days. No later than 9/6/2016, plaintiff Copart and defendant Sparta shall make initial disclosures regarding the newly pled claims in the Third Amended Complaint. (Donati, J)
June 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 6/28/16 ORDERING that the requests to seal 115 , 120 , 122 are DENIED. If Copart or Sparta again file such unsupported requests to seal, the court cautions each party will be required to show cause why it should not be subject to monetary sanctions. (Kastilahn, A)
June 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 6/1/2016 ORDERING that the Court DENIES Sparta's 82 Request to Seal Document. Copart's 83 Motion to Amend the Complaint is GRANTED and all currently scheduled dates are VACATED. The Third Amended Complaint is to be filed on the docket in the form proposed within seven (7) days of this order. If the case does not settle at the settlement conference being convened by the magistrate judge the parties shall submit a joint status report proposing a prospective schedule for the case within twenty-one (21) days of the conclusion of the settlement conference. (Zignago, K.)
May 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 5/19/2016 DENYING 111 Amended Motion for Protective Order; ORDERING the parties to meet and confer regarding a settlement conference and to advice the Courtroom Deputy for Judge Delaney by 6/24/2016, whether the parties desire to set a settlement conference date; REMINDING the parties that absent a waiver of disqualification of Judge Delaney, the settlement conference will be set before another Magistrate Judge. (Michel, G.)
April 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 114 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 4/28/16, ORDERING that the Pretrial Order is amended as follows: the Fact Discovery Cut-off is extended to May 16 for depositions only, the Expert Disclosure deadline is extended to May 31, the Rebuttal Expert disclosure deadline is extended to 6/21, and the Expert Discovery cut-off is extended to July 15. (Kastilahn, A)
April 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 4/28/2016 ORDERING that no later than 5/2/2016, defendant shall produce a privilege log for the documents withheld as described in the joint statement at ECF No. 103 at p. 15 (Joint Statement at 14:1-2). The motion to compel further responses to request for production of documents nos. 75-78 is DENIED. The hearing on plaintiff's 108 motion for protective order is VACATED. Prior to the filing of any further motion to compel or other discovery motion, the parties shall engage in the informal procedures for the resolution of discovery disputes set forth on the undersigneds court website. (Zignago, K.)
April 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 4/22/16 ORDERING having considered Plaintiff/Counterdefendant Copart, Inc. ("Copart") Request to Seal Documents, and the papers filed in relation thereto, and finding good cause therefor: Copart's request to seal exhibits O through U to the Declaration of Ian. T. Long In Support of Sparta's Position In the Joint Statement Regarding Discovery Dispute is HEREBY GRANTED. (Becknal, R)
April 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 4/20/2016 ORDERING that the 77 , 95 Motion to Compel is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. (Zignago, K.)
April 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 4/14/2016 ORDERING the Hearing on the Motions 77 , 78 to Compel is hereby CONTINUED to 4/27/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 24 (CKD) before Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney; Joint Statement with respect to the Motions to Compel shall be submitted on or before 4/18/2016.(Reader, L)
April 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 90 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 04/06/16 ORDERING that the hearing on the 77 78 Motions to Compel are RESET for 4/20/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 24 (CKD) before Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney. The parties shall submit a joint statement with respect to the Motions to Compel by 04/11/16. (Benson, A)
March 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 3/29/2016 ORDERING 78 , 77 that hearing on the Motions to Compel is Reset for 4/13/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 24 (CKD) before Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney; the parties shall submit a joint statement with respect to the Motions to Compel on or before 4/4/2016. (Reader, L)
September 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 9/14/15 ORDERING the motion to dismiss, ECF No. 58 , is DENIED. (Becknal, R)
June 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 6/9/2015 GRANTING 47 Motion to Dismiss with leave to amend as to Sparta Consulting, Inc.'s equitable claims, claims 2, 5 and 6, and account stated claim, claim 4; GRANTING 47 Motion to Dismiss wit hout leave to amend as to Sparta Consulting, Inc.'s unfair competition claim, claim 7; DENYING 47 Motion to Dismiss in all other respects; DENYING 45 Motion to Dismiss; GRANTING Sparta Consulting, Inc. 21 days to file an amended counterclaim. (Michel, G.)
November 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 44 STIPULATION AND ORDER regarding electronically stored information, discovery, and document production format signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 11/18/2014. (Michel, G)
September 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 9/22/14. Case number 2:14-cv-1884 JAM CKD is reassigned to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller and consolidated with case number 2:14-cv-0046 KJM CKD for all purposes, including trial. The parties' 9/26/14 deadline to respond to the complaints is VACATED until further order of the court. The parties shall submit a Joint Status Report by 9/25/14. (Manzer, C)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sparta Consulting, Inc. v. Copart, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sparta Consulting, Inc.
Represented By: Paul Timothy Llewellyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Copart, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?