Rinehart et al v. Walgreen Co.
Plaintiff: Debbie G. Rinehart
Defendant: Walgreen Co.
Intervenor_plaintiff: United States of America and State of California
Case Number: 2:2014cv00148
Filed: January 21, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Nature of Suit: False Claims Act
Cause of Action: 31:3729
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER DISMISSING CASE signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 7/21/2017 ORDERING All claims asserted in this action are DISMISSED with prejudice as to Relator; All claims asserted in this action for the Covered Conduct as that term is defined in the Settlement Agreement between the United States, California, Relator, and defendant Walgreen Co. are DISMISSED with prejudice as to the United States and California. All other claims asserted in this action are DISMISSED without prejudice as to the United States and California. CASE CLOSED (Washington, S)
May 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 5/15/17: The court tentatively finds it unnecessary for any part of the case to remain sealed. Within fourteen (14) days of this order, any party may SHOW CAUSE, if any there is, as to why the balance of the documents of record in this action should not be unsealed. (Kaminski, H)
March 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 3/24/2017 ORDERING that the 25 First Amended Complaint, the 53 Notice of Partial Intervention for Settlement, and this Order be UNSEALED; ORDERING that all other previously-filed contents of the Court's file in this action remain SEALED and not made public, or served upon the defendant, pending further order of this Court; LIFTING the seal on all matters occurring in this action after the date of this Order. (Michel, G.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rinehart et al v. Walgreen Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debbie G. Rinehart
Represented By: Joy P. Clairmont, PHV
Represented By: Phillip Richard Atillio Mastagni
Represented By: Daniel R. Miller, PHV
Represented By: Benjamin A. Waters, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Catherine J. Swann(Designation Assistant US Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: State of California
Represented By: Emmanuel Ramon Salazar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?