Stewart v. Cassidy
Plaintiff: Colleen Stewart
Defendant: Kevin J Cassidy
Case Number: 2:2014cv00326
Filed: January 31, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: El Dorado
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Presiding Judge: Garland E. Burrell
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Medical Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 8/1/16 ORDERING that the trial date of 10/3/16 is VACATED. Trial will be reset as necessary. The timing for exhibits and objections thereto are vacated. (Kastilahn, A)
May 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 115 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 5/10/2016 ORDERING that the depositions of Dr. Michael Gurney, plaintiff Colleen Stewart and defendant's expert witness Dr. Theodore Jacobson, limited to the issue of speci al damages incurred since the first trial of this matter, shall take place no later than 7/29/2016. Jury Trial is CONTINUED to 10/3/2016 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 24 (CKD) before Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney. All pre-trial dates, including th e date upon which to file the stipulation of special damages, are continued accordingly. The stipulation of special damages shall now be filed no later than 9/19/2016. The parties shall comply with the requirements for exhibits and objections thereto, as outlined in the final pretrial order at 9:10-21 and 10:11-16, and the requirements for further trial preparation, as outlined in the final pretrial order at 11:16-26, no later than 9/26/2016. (Zignago, K.)
October 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 10/26/15: Jury Trial set for 6/6/2016 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 24 (CKD) before Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney. No later than May 23, 2016, the parties shall submit a stipulation regarding the amount of special damages claimed by plaintiff. (Kaminski, H)
October 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 10/8/15 ORDERING that this matter is SET for Jury Trial on 1/19/2016 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 24 (CKD) before Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney. The parties shall comply with the requirements for exhibits and objections thereto, as outlined in the final pretrial order at 9:10-21 and 10:11-16, and the requirements for further trial preparation, as outlined in the final pretrial order at 11:16- 26, no later than 1/4/2016. No later than 1/4/16, the parties shall submit a stipulation regarding the amount of special damages claimed by plaintiff. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
June 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 6/4/2015. Plaintiff filed an Objection to defense Exhibit 22, dental records of Brian Galbraith, D.D.S., asserting that the records should be excluded in their entirety. Defendant has filed a Re sponse. The parties have stipulated that defendant need not authenticate the records. Good cause appearing, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's Objection is OVERRULED as premature. The Objection may be renewed at Trial if foundational requirements for use of records at Trial are not met. (Marciel, M)
June 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 6/2/15 DENYING 40 ; GRANTING 43 , 44 , 45 , 46 , 47 and 49 Motions in Limine. (Meuleman, A)
May 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 5/28/15 re 37 setting findings and orders for Jurisdiction/Venue, Jury/Non-Jury, Undisputed Facts, Disputed Factual Issues, Disputed Evidentiary Issues, Relief Sought, Points of Law, Witnesse s, Exhibits, Schedules and Summaries, Discovery Documents or Motions, Stipulations, Amendments/Dismissals, Further Trial Preparation, Settlement Negotiations, Agreed Statements, Separate Trial of Issues, Impartial Experts/Limitation of Experts, Attorneys' Fees, Miscellaneous, Estimate of Trial Time/Trial Date, Proposed Jury Voir Dire and Proposed Jury Instructions, Objections to Pretrial Order.. (Meuleman, A)
April 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 04/14/15 ORDERING that Defendant will be allowed to substitute a new expert by 04/30/15. Defendant will produce said expert promptly for immediate deposition. All parties shall have until 05/13 /15 to complete any law and motion matters regarding the discovery of this new expert. Final Pretrial Conference RESET to 5/27/2015 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 24 (CKD) before Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney; Jury Trial RESET to 6/15/2015 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 24 (CKD) before Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney.(Benson, A)
December 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 12/10/2014 ORDERING that the deposition of defense expert Robert Gillis, Jr. D.M.D. be completed by 1/9/2015; ORDERING that all other aspects of the 14 Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Order remain in full effect. (Michel, G)
September 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 9/26/2014 ORDERING that discovery be completed as to the deposition of defense expert Dr. Mark Crane, M.D., D.D.S. by 12/19/2014. (Michel, G)
September 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 9/9/14. The physical examination of the plaintiff shall proceed according to the terms of the parties' stipulation. (Manzer, C)
May 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STATUS (PRETRIAL SCHEDULING) ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 5/8/14: Initial disclosures shall be made no later than May 14, 2014; Discovery due by 12/10/2014; Dispositive Motions filed by 2/25/2015; Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/29/2015 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 24 (CKD) before Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney; Jury Trial set for 6/8/2015 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 24 (CKD) before Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney. (Kaminski, H)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stewart v. Cassidy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colleen Stewart
Represented By: David Edward May
Represented By: Bruce S. Osterman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin J Cassidy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?