Martinez v. Babcock
Petitioner: Mario G. Martinez
Respondent: Michael Babcock
Case Number: 2:2014cv00333
Filed: February 3, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Lassen
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 12 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 1/6/2015 RECOMMENDING that this action be dismissed without prejudice. Referred to Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.; Objections due within 14 days. (Yin, K)
November 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 11/10/2014 ORDERING petitioner to submit, within 30 days, a newly completed request to proceed ifp with a certified trust account statement or, alternatively, petitioner may pay the $5.00 filing fee; the Clerk shall send petitioner (1) a copy of this order, (2) a copy of the 9/25/2014 order, and (3) a blank ifp form; and the Clerk shall modify plaintiff's address of record as FCI Safford and send this order and related materials to plaintiff at FCI Safford.(Yin, K)
September 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 9/24/2014 ORDERING petitioner to submit, within 30 days, a newly completed affidavit to proceed ifp, together wtih a certified copy of his prision trust account statement; alternatively, petitioner may submit the $5.00 filing fee; and the Clerk shall send petitioner a blank form to apply for ifp status. (Yin, K)
June 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 6/24/2014 ORDERING petitioner to submit, within 30 days, the appropriate affidavit to proceed ifp, or pay the filing fee; and the Clerk shall send petitioner a blank ifp form. (Yin, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martinez v. Babcock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Michael Babcock
Represented By: Bureau of Prisons Regional Counsel
Represented By: Justin Lee, GOVT(Designation Assistant US Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Mario G. Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?