Gutierrez, et al. v. Carter Brothers Security Services, LLC, et al.
Plaintiff: Ramses Gutierrez, Jonathan Jacob, Toussaint Chivars, Joshua Espiritu, Patrick Williams, Sam Preeg, Ricardo Sapasap, Armando Torres, Keondre Masters, Gianfranco Uy, Christopher Addo, Alan Osorio, Keith Polee, Earl Gray and Zachary Finer
Defendant: Carter Brothers Security Services, LLC, AT&T Digital Life, Inc., Pacific Bell Telephone Company and AT&T Corp.
Case Number: 2:2014cv00351
Filed: February 4, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 5/5/2020 GRANTING 131 Unopposed Motion for Final Approval of Class Settlement and Entry of Judgment. CASE CLOSED. (Huang, H)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 12/3/2019 GRANTING 126 Motion for Preliminary Approval of the Class Settlement and Direction of Notice. Phoenix Class Action Administration Solutions of Orange, California, is APPOINTED as class administrator. The parties are directed to give notice to putative class members. The draft notice of settlement submitted to the Court as Exhibit D to the Declaration of Joseph W. Rose is APPROVED. The final approval hearing is scheduled for Thursday, 4/30/2020, at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 7. (Zignago, K.)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 115 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 12/30/2018 VACATING 105 Supplemental Scheduling Order. The Parties to file a Joint Status Report on or before 1/29/2019.(Zignago, K.)
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 113 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 11/28/2018 ORDERING the referral to the Court's Voluntary Resolution Program is Postponed; and the Parties shall file a Joint Status Report on or before 1/28/2019 regarding the Status of Settlement Discussions. If the matter has not been settled, the Parties will indicate at that time whether they agree to participate in the Voluntary Dispute Resolution Program. (Becknal, R)
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 111 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 8/28/18 ORDERING that The matter's referral to the Court's Voluntary Resolution Program is postponed; and The Parties shall file a Joint Status Report on or before 11/26/2018, regarding the status of settlement discussions. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
October 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 10/5/17 ORDERING the parties are directed to file a joint status report not later than October 16, 2017. In addition, the Court previously took under submission Plaintiffs' Motion t o Conditionally Certify FLSA Collective Action (ECF No. 79 ) and Leave to Renew Motion (ECF No. 80 ). Given that judgment has since been ordered against Carter Brothers, those Motions are hereby DENIED without prejudice to renewal addressing the changed status of the parties. (Becknal, R)
September 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 102 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 09/14/17 GRANTING Gordon & Rees LLP's 88 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel; the Carter Brother's 64 Answer is STRICKEN; and DEFAULT JUDGMENT is entered against Carter Brothers. (Benson, A.)
August 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 08/29/17 ORDERING that Carter Brothers shall have until 09/08/17, to seek--through counsel--any modification of the Court's 97 06/27/17 Memorandum and Order. Otherwise, the Court shall proceed as originally set out in that prior decision. (Benson, A.)
June 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 96 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 6/16/2017 ORDERING the Scheduling Order is amended to vacate the Parties' deadline to meet and confer regarding initial disclosures pursuant to Rule 26 (f) and all rel ated deadlines; and Not later than ten (10) days following the date an order is electronically filed resolving Gordon & Rees' Motion to Withdraw as Counsel, the parties are directed to file a joint status report regarding the issuance of an Amended Scheduling Order. (Becknal, R)
May 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 89 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 5/3/17: The June 15, 2017, hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion is VACATED. (Kaminski, H)
April 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 82 INITIAL PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 4/12/2017 ORDERING: Within sixty (60) days from the date of this Order the parties shall meet and confer regarding their discovery plan. All discovery, with the exc eption of expert discovery, shall be completed no later than three hundred sixty-five (365) days from the date of this Order. All counsel are to designate in writing and serve upon all other parties the name, address, and area of expertise of each ex pert that they propose to tender at trial not later than sixty (60) days after the close of discovery. Supplemental List due within thirty (30) days after the designation of expert witnesses. The parties shall file dispositive motions no later than o ne hundred eighty (180) days after the close of non-expert discovery. The parties are ordered to file a Joint Notice of Trial Readiness not later than thirty (30) days after receiving this Courts ruling(s) on the last filed dispositive motion(s). If the parties do not intend to file dispositive motions, the parties are ordered to file a Joint Notice of Trial Readiness not later than thirty (30) days after the close of the designation of supplemental expert witnesses. Any objections to Initial Pretrial Scheduling Order are due within seven (7) days from the date of this Order.(Washington, S)
March 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 3/20/2015 ORDERING that Plaintiff's 54 Motion to Certify Class is DENIED without prejudice to refiling once Carter Brothers' appeal has been adjudicated. (Zignago, K.)
October 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 62 MEMORANDUM and ORDER denying 33 Motion to Change Venue and 34 Motion to Compel signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 10/29/14. (Kaminski, H)
October 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 61 MEMORANDUM and ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 10/29/14 ORDERING that Defendant's Motion to Dismiss 32 is DENIED. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gutierrez, et al. v. Carter Brothers Security Services, LLC, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramses Gutierrez
Represented By: Joseph Wayne Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Jacob
Represented By: Joseph Wayne Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Toussaint Chivars
Represented By: Joseph Wayne Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Espiritu
Represented By: Joseph Wayne Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Williams
Represented By: Joseph Wayne Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sam Preeg
Represented By: Joseph Wayne Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricardo Sapasap
Represented By: Joseph Wayne Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Armando Torres
Represented By: Joseph Wayne Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keondre Masters
Represented By: Joseph Wayne Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gianfranco Uy
Represented By: Joseph Wayne Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Addo
Represented By: Joseph Wayne Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alan Osorio
Represented By: Joseph Wayne Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Polee
Represented By: Joseph Wayne Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Earl Gray
Represented By: Joseph Wayne Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zachary Finer
Represented By: Joseph Wayne Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carter Brothers Security Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T Digital Life, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific Bell Telephone Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?