Quinn v. Warren et al
Plaintiff: Daniel M Quinn
Defendant: Warren, Nelson, Hernandez, R Steed and Scott R. Jones
Case Number: 2:2014cv00408
Filed: February 6, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 03/28/17 ordering that this case is dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. CASE CLOSED. (Plummer, M)
February 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 2/9/2017 ORDERING within 30 days, plaintiff shall complete and return the required paperwork so that the USM can attempt service on the defendants. Failure to comply with this order and return the required paperwork will result in this case being dismissed for failure to prosecute.(Yin, K)
January 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 1/04/16 ordering plaintiff's amended complaint 14 is disregarded because it is not in the proper form. Plaintiff shall have 21 days from the filing of this order to file an amended complaint. If plaintiff does not file an amended complaint in the proper form, this case will proceed on the original complaint against defendants Warren, Nelson and Hernandez. Plaintiff's request for legal research 15 is denied. Plaintiff's req uest for the status of this case 15 is granted insofar as this order directs him as to his next steps. Within 30 days of the filing of this order, plaintiff must either pay the filing fee in full or submit a non-prisoner application to proceed in forma pauperis. The clerk of the court to send plaintiff a blank in forma pauperis application used by non-prisoners and a blank complaint form for prisoner complaints under 42 USC 1983. (Plummer, M)
July 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 7/18/14 ORDERING that Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint within 21 days from the date of this order; and, if plaintiff fails to file an amended complaint within the time provided, the court will proceed to order service on remaining defendants Hernandez, Nelson, and Warren.(Dillon, M)
June 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Daniel M. Quinn signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 06/25/14. The Sheriff of Sacramento County is to collect payments from plaintiff's account and forward to the clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. Clerk to serve this order and a copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Sheriff of Sacramento County. Clerk to also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: Financial)(Plummer, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Quinn v. Warren et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel M Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R Steed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott R. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?