Joseph v. Tseng, et al
Plaintiff: Alonzo Joseph
Defendant: S. Tseng, D. Smiley and E Horowitz
Case Number: 2:2014cv00476
Filed: February 13, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER, FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 4/29/15 ORDERING that the Clerk of the Court shall randomlyassign a United States District Judge to this action. Further, it is RECOMMENDED that the amended complaint (ECF No. 12 ) be dismissed for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted and that the Clerk bedirected to close the case. Randomly assigned and referred to Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.; Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Dillon, M)
September 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 9/29/2014 DENYING 4 Motion for Summary Judgment and DENYING 8 Motion for Default Judgment. The complaint is DISMISSED with leave to amend within 30 days. The amended complaint must bear 2:14-cv-0476 EFB as the case number and be titled First Amended Complaint. (Donati, J)
March 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 3/5/14 ORDERING that defendants shall have thirty days to respond to the complaint from the service of the screening order.(Dillon, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joseph v. Tseng, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alonzo Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Tseng
Represented By: Jason Albert Braxton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Smiley
Represented By: Jason Albert Braxton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E Horowitz
Represented By: Jason Albert Braxton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?