Alford v. Dang, et al.
Plaintiff: Tracy Fidel Alford
Defendant: Lam Dang, Jones, J. Clough, S. Ramirez, J. McComber and T. Virga
Case Number: 2:2014cv00714
Filed: March 18, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 46 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 7/16/2018 recommending that Defendants' motion for summary judgment 37 be granted and this action be dismissed without prejudice. Referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Within fourteen days after being served with these findings and recommendations, any party may file written objections with the court and serve a copy on all parties.(Cannarozzi, N)
May 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 05/31/18 VACATING 39 the Findings and Recommendations. Defendant shall file a reply (if any) to plaintiffs opposition 43 withinfourteen days from the date this order is served. The motion for summary judgment will thenstand submitted. (Plummer, M)
April 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 4/16/18 GRANTING 40 Motion to vacate the discovery and dispositive motion deadlines. (Plummer, M)
April 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 4/11/2018 RECOMMENDING this action be dismissed without prejudice. Referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller; Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Yin, K)
March 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 03/08/18 ORDERING that within 21 days of the date of this order, plaintiff shall file either an opposition to the motion or a statement of no opposition. (Plummer, M)
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 9/29/2017 GRANTING 24 Motion for Leave to file Late Objections construed as Motion for Relief from Judgment. The 22 Order and 23 Judgment are VACATED. This matter is REFERRED back to the assigned magistrate judge for further proceedings. Plaintiff shall respond timely to each and every future court order that requires action. Failure to do so may result in the dismissal of the action with prejudice. (Donati, J)
August 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 8/09/17 ORDERING that The Clerk shall send plaintiff a blank summons, one USM-285 form and instructions for service of process on defendant Clough. Within 30 days, plaintiff shall return the att ached Notice of Submission of documents with the completed blank summons and USM-285 form, which shall be completed to include a valid address for service of process on defendant Clough. No extensions of time to comply with this order will be grante d. Failure to comply with this order will result in the denial of plaintiff'smotion for leave to file late objections and the confirmation of the 23 03/14/17 judgment. The court will not reconsider the 23 03/20/17 judgment or reopen this action unless plaintiff timely files the completed summons and USM-285 form. (Benson, A.)
September 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 21 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 09/08/16 recommending that this action be dismissed. Referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
May 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 16 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 05/07/15 recommending that this action be dismissed for failure to prosecute. Referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
February 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Tracy Fidel Alford signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 2/9/2015. CDCR shall collect an initial partial filing fee and thereafter the balance in monthly payments and forwar d to the Clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. The Clerk is directed to serve this order and copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Director of CDCR. The Clerk shall also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: CDCR, Financial)(Yin, K)
April 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 4/4/2014 ORDERING 8 Order is VACATED; Court will, in due course, screen plaintiff's complaint. (Waggoner, D)
April 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 04/01/14 ordering plaintiff has 30 days from the date this order is served to submit the required trust account statement. The clerk of the court is directed to send to plaintiff a new form application to proceed in forma pauperis by a prisoner. (Plummer, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alford v. Dang, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy Fidel Alford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lam Dang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Clough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Ramirez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. McComber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Virga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?