Rowland v. Unknown
Plaintiff: Keith Rowland
Defendant: Unknown
Case Number: 2:2014cv00739
Filed: March 21, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: San Joaquin
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 22 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 10/29/14 recommending that this action be dismissed without prejudice. Referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller; Objections to F&R due within 14 days.(Dillon, M)
July 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 7/24/14 ORDERING the Director of the CDC to collect and forward payment from the trust account of Keith Roland and forward payment to the court until the balance is paid in full. Clerk of the Court is directed to serve a copy of this order and a copy of plaintiff's signed in forma pauperis affidavit to the Director of the CDC; and the Clerk of the Court is further directed to serve a copy of this order on the Financial Department of the court. (cc CDC, Financial)(Dillon, M)
May 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 5/19/14 ORDERING that the findings and recommendations (ECF No. 4 ) are hereby vacated; Plaintiffs motion for an extension of time (ECF No. 5 ) is granted; and Plaintiff is granted thirty days from the date of this order in which to file a complaint and an application to proceed in forma pauperis.(Dillon, M)
May 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 05/06/14 ORDERING the clerk of the court is directed to assign a district judge to this case. U.S. District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller randomly assigned to this case. Also, RECOMMENDING that this action be dismissed without prejudice. Referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rowland v. Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Rowland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?