Valerio v. Compass Bank
Plaintiff: Gloria Valerio
Defendant: Compass Bank
Case Number: 2:2014cv00741
Filed: March 21, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Lawrence K. Karlton
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 05:704
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 119 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 4/20/17 ORDERING that this case is DISMISSED in its entirety, with prejudice, and without an award of attorney's fees or costs to any party. CASE CLOSED(Becknal, R)
April 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 4/17/17 GRANTING Defendant Compass Bank's ex parte application for leave to perpetuate the testimony of Matthew Farmer for trial. (Becknal, R)
March 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 75 AMENDED PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 3/27/17: Trial will commence on or about April 24, 2017, at 9:00 a.m. (Kaminski, H)
December 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 66 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 12/14/16: Defendant shall complete the deposition of Diana Masten, R.N. by February, 28, 2017. The Parties shall meet and confer in good faith and fully cooperate to complete Diana Masten's deposition in a timely manner. (Kaminski, H)
October 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 64 STIPULATION and PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 10/26/2016. (Zignago, K.)
October 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 62 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 10/24/2016 ORDERING depositions shall be completed by 12/31/2016. (Donati, J)
July 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 7/20/2016 ORDERING that the 52 Designation/Disclosure of Expert Witness be sealed throughout the life of the case, and indefinitely beyond; GRANTING access to said docoment to the parties, the parties' counsel of record and the Court; ORDERING that this seal remain in place until otherwise ordered. (Michel, G.)
March 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 3/31/2016 ORDERING Plaintiff Gloria Valerio shall complete her deposition in this matter by 4/22/2016; any violation of the Parties' Stipulation and/or this Order shall subject theoffending party to appropriate sanctions, as determined by the Court. (Reader, L)
February 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 47 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 2/3/2016 ORDERING Plaintiff Gloria Valerio to complete her deposition by 4/1/2016; ORDERING Plaintiff Gloria Valerio to attend and complete her independent medical examination with Dr. Scott on 3/2/2016; CAUTIONING all parties that any violation of this Stipulation and/or Order shall subject the offending party to appropriate sanctions, as determined by the Court. (Michel, G.)
December 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 45 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 12/16/2015 ORDERING that experts be disclosed by 7/18/2016; ORDERING that rebuttal experts be disclosed by 8/18/2016; ORDERING that discovery be completed by 10/28/2016; ORDERING that dispositiv e motions be filed by 12/27/2016 and that such motions be noticed for hearing on 1/24/2017 at 01:30 PM; ORDERING the parties to file a joint pretrial statement by 3/10/2017; CONTINUING the Final Pretrial Conference to 3/17/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before Judge John A. Mendez; CONTINUING the Jury Trial to 4/24/2017 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before Judge John A. Mendez. (Michel, G.)
September 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 9/9/15: 19 MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS ATTORNEY is GRANTED. (Kaminski, H)
May 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 5/22/2015 MODIFYING 12 Amended Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Order, 14 Minute Order; ORDERING that expert disclosure be completed by 11/20/2015, that rebuttal expert disclosure be comp leted by 12/21/2015, that discovery be completed by 2/29/2016, that dispositive motions be filed by 4/20/2016, that the hearing on such motions be held on 5/18/2016 at 09:30 AM, and that the joint pretrial statement be fil ed by 7/8/2016; SETTING the Final Pretrial Conference for 7/15/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before Judge John A. Mendez; SETTING the Jury Trial for 8/29/2016 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before Judge John A. Mendez. (Michel, G.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Valerio v. Compass Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gloria Valerio
Represented By: Lawrance A. Bohm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Compass Bank
Represented By: Carolyn G Burnette
Represented By: Jerry James Deschler, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?