Hollins v. Lozano, et al.
Plaintiff: Sean M. Hollins
Defendant: J. D. Lozano, S. Pina, S. Niehus, J. C. Smith, C. Gipson, K. J. Allen, J. C. Garcia and T. Morton
Case Number: 2:2014cv00964
Filed: April 18, 2014
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Tulare
Presiding Judge: Craig M. Kellison
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 4/5/2016 DISMISSING this action, without prejudice, pursuant to plaintiff's 9 notice and Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(i). CASE CLOSED. (Yin, K)
December 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 12/28/2015 ORDERING plaintiff to SHOW CAUSE in writing, within 30 days, why defendants Lozano and Allen should not be dismissed from this action for failure to state a claim. Service is appropriate for J. C. Garcia, C. Gipson, T. Morton, S. Niehus, S. Pina, J. C. Smith. The Clerk shall send plaintiff forms for service to be completed and returned within 30 days, along with the Notice of submission. (Yin, K)
October 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 10/14/2014 GRANTING plaintiff's 2 motion to proceed IFP; plaintiff shall pay the $350.00 filing fee; CDCR shall collect, from the prison account of Sean M. Hollins, an initial partia l filing fee and thereafter the balance in monthly payments and forward to the Clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full; the Clerk is directed to serve this order and copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Director of CDCR; the Clerk shall also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: CDCR, Financial)(Yin, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hollins v. Lozano, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean M. Hollins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. D. Lozano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Pina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Niehus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. C. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Gipson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. J. Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. C. Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Morton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?