Emerson v. Foulk, et al.
Plaintiff: Scott Emerson
Defendant: F. Foulk, Carrera, Gonzalez, Luigs, Lewis and Hernandez
Case Number: 2:2014cv00972
Filed: April 21, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Lassen
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Presiding Judge: Troy L. Nunley
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER and WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM ISSUED signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 12/22/15 ordering the Custodian to produce Scott Emerson on 2/04/16 at 9:00 a.m. in courtroom 1 before Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison. Custodian is ordered to notify the court of any changes in custody and to provide new custodian with a copy of this writ. Clerk shall serve a copy of this order and writ on the Custodian and Out-to-Court Desk. (cc: CMK and OTCD)(Plummer, M)
December 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 12/4/2015 DENYING 39 Motion for Reconsideration. (Zignago, K.)
August 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER denying 35 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 08/20/15. (Plummer, M)
June 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 06/24/15 ordering plaintiff's motion for an extension of time 28 is denied without prejudice to renewal. Plaintiff's application for expert opinion 29 is denied. (Plummer, M)
December 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER, ORDER DIRECTING USM signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 12/2/14 to serve * complaint * filed on * 4/21/14,* on * Luigs*, within 14 days. Clerk of the Court shall serve on plaintiff a copy of the Local Rules of Court.(Dillon, M)
July 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Scott Emerson signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 07/15/14. CDC is to collect payments from plaintiff's account and forward to the clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. Clerk to serve this order and a copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Director of CDC. Clerk to also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: CDC Director and Financial)(Plummer, M)
May 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 5/8/2014 DISMISSING plaintiff's 5 application to proceed IFP, without prejudice; the Clerk shall send plaintiff a new ifp application; and plaintiff shall submit, within 30 days, a completed ifp application. (Yin, K)
April 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 4/30/14 ORDERING Plaintiff shall submit, within thirty days from the date of this order, an affidavit in support of his request to proceed in forma pauperis on the form provided by the Clerk o f Court, or the appropriate filing fee; plaintiff's failure to comply with this order will result in a recommendation that this action be dismissed; and the Clerk of the Court is directed to send plaintiff a new Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis By a Prisoner. (Becknal, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Emerson v. Foulk, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Emerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F. Foulk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luigs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?