Boudreaux v. Cate, et al.
Plaintiff: Thaddeus Boudreaux
Defendant: Matthew Cate, Tim Virga, J. Clough, D. Deroco and K. Daly
Case Number: 2:2014cv00997
Filed: April 23, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Presiding Judge: Garland E. Burrell
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER and WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM ISSUED signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 03/09/17 ordering the Custodian to produce Thaddeus Boudreaux on 5/23/17 at 9:00 a.m. in courtroom 25 before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman. Custodian is ordered to notify the court of any changes in custody and to provide new custodian with a copy of this writ. Clerk shall serve a copy of this order and writ on the Custodian and Out-to-Court Desk. (cc: KJN and OTCD) (Plummer, M)
March 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER adopting 40 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS signed by District Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 3/7/17: Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. 28) is granted in part and denied in part. Within thirty days from the date of this order, plaintiff shall file a Third Amended Complaint. Plaintiff's October 14, 2016 Motion to Stay (ECF No. 35) is denied as moot and Defendants' Motion to Strike (ECF No. 37) is denied. (Kaminski, H)
February 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER, FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 2/3/2017 ORDERING plaintiff's 33 motion to amend the complaint is DENIED and plaintiff's 38 third amended complaint is DISREGARDED; plaintiff's [34 ] motion for an extension of time is GRANTED. IT IS RECOMMENDED that defendants' 28 motion to dismiss be granted in part and denied in part; plaintiff be given 30 days from the date of ruling on these findings and recommendations to file a third amended complaint; plaintiff's 35 motion to stay be denied as moot; defendants' 37 motion to strike be denied. Referred to Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr.; Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (See F&R For Details)(Yin, K)
September 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Thaddeus Boudreaux signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 9/12/2014. CDCR shall collect an initial partial filing fee and thereafter the balance in monthly payments and forward t o the Clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. The Clerk is directed to serve this order and copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Director of CDCR. The Clerk shall also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: CDCR, Financial)(Yin, K)
April 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 4/30/14 ORDERING Plaintiff shall submit, within thirty days from the date of this order, an affidavit in support of his request to proceed in forma pauperis on the form provided by the Clerk of Cour t, or the appropriate filing fee; Plaintiff's failure to comply with this order will result in a recommendation that this action be dismissed; and The Clerk of the Court is directed to send plaintiff a new Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis By a Prisoner. (Becknal, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boudreaux v. Cate, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thaddeus Boudreaux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Cate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Virga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Clough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Deroco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Daly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?