Slamen v. Sabin
Plaintiff: Mark Slamen
Defendant: Manuel Sabin
Case Number: 2:2014cv01067
Filed: April 30, 2014
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Solano
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 05/14/15 ordering plaintiff sent a letter to the court in which he requests, among other things, the appointment of counsel 20 . The court takes no action on plaintiff's filing as this case is now closed. Plaintiff is hereby informed that the court will not respond to future filings in this action that are not authorized by the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure or the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure. (Plummer, M)
April 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 4/29/15 ORDERING that Plaintiffs request for appointment of counsel (ECF No. 16 ) is denied; and Plaintiff's request for an extension of time is granted and plaintiff shall have an additional 30 days in which to file his amended complaint. (Dillon, M)
April 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Mark Slamen signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 4/6/2015. CDCR shall collect an initial partial filing fee and thereafter the balance in monthly payments and forward to the Clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. The Clerk is directed to serve this order and copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Director of CDCR. The Clerk shall also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: CDCR, Financial)(Yin, K)
May 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 5/8/2014 ORDERING that plaintiff has 30 days to submit the required trust account statement; and the Clerk shall send plaintiff a new ifp application. (Yin, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Slamen v. Sabin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Slamen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manuel Sabin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?