Duran v. California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation, et al,
Plaintiff: Jason Duran
Defendant: California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation, Kelsoe and Warden
Case Number: 2:2014cv01080
Filed: May 1, 2014
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Craig M. Kellison
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 9/28/2017 DISMISSING this action and DIRECTING Clerk of Court to close this case. CASE CLOSED. (Henshaw, R)
August 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 08/17/17 ordering plaintiff shall show cause in writing, within 30 days of the date of this order, why this actionshould not be dismissed for failure to state a claim. (Plummer, M)
May 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 05/12/17 ordering plaintiff's amended complaint is dismissed with leave to amend. Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint within 30 days of the date of service of this order. (Plummer, M)
December 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 12/21/2015 ORDERING plaintiff to show cause in writing, within 30 days, why this action should not be dismissed for failure to file an amended complaint. (Yin, K)
June 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 6/23/15 ORDERING that plaintiffs complaint is dismissed with leave to amend; and plaintiff shall file an amended complaint within 30 days of the date of service of this order.(Dillon, M)
October 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 10/17/14 ORDERING that 2 Motion to Proceed IFP is GRANTED;ORDERING that the Sheriff of Sacramento County or a designee shall collect from the prison trust account of J ason Duran an initial partial filing fee and shall forward the amount to the Clerk of the Court. The Clerk of the Court is directed to serve a copy of this order and a copy of plaintiffs signed in forma pauperis affidavit on the Sheriff of Sacramento County. Clerk of the Court is directed to serve a copy of this order on the Financial Department of the court. (cc Financial )(Dillon, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Duran v. California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation, et al,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Duran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelsoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?