Jamison v. Union Bank
Plaintiff: Jeremy L. Jamison
Defendant: Union Bank
Case Number: 2:2014cv01194
Filed: May 15, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 24 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that this action be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 4/30/15. F&R referred to Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. Objections to F&R due within fourteen days. (Kaminski, H)
October 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Jeremy L. Jamison signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 10/28/2014. CDCR shall collect an initial partial filing fee and thereafter the balance in monthly payments and forwar d to the Clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. The Clerk is directed to serve this order and copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Director of CDCR. The Clerk shall also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: CDCR, Financial)(Yin, K)
September 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 9/11/14 ORDERING that plaintiff shall submit, within thirty days from the date of this order, a certified copy of his prison trust account statement for the six month period immediately preceding the filing of the complaint. (Dillon, M)
June 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 6/26/14 ORDERING that Plaintiff shall submit, within thirty days from the date of this order, a certified copy of his prison trust account statement for the six month period immediately preceding the filing of the complaint. Clerk of the Court is directed to send plaintiff a new Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis By a Prisoner.(Dillon, M)
May 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 5/19/14 ORDERING that the Clerk of the Court shall provide plaintiff with another copy of the in forma pauperis application used by this court; and Plaintiff shall submit, within 30 days from the date of this order, a fully completed in forma pauperis application.(Dillon, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jamison v. Union Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy L. Jamison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?