United States of America v. Approximately $546,104.80 seized from Wachovia Bank Account Number 2000019689368
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Approximately $546,104.80 seized from Wachovia Bank Account Number 2000019689368
Case Number: 2:2014cv01242
Filed: May 21, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 13 FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORFEITURE signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 8/11/14 re 12 Request. CASE CLOSED. (Meuleman, A)
July 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 7/21/2014 ORDERING that the deadline for filing a joint status report is EXTENDED from 7/21/2014 to 9/19/2014. (Zignago, K.)
May 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RELATED CASE ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 5/28/14 ORDERING that these actions are related. (Kastilahn, A)
May 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER FOR PUBLICATION signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 5/22/14. (Manzer, C)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Approximately $546,104.80 seized from Wachovia Bank Account Number 2000019689368
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $546,104.80 seized from Wachovia Bank Account Number 2000019689368
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Kevin Christopher Khasigian(Designation Assistant US Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?