Contreras v. National Guard Bureau et al
Plaintiff: Graciela M. Contreras
Defendant: National Guard Bureau, Frank J Grass, Charles T Hagel, David Baldwin, Matthew Dana, Louis Birdsong, Derrik Allen, Kimberely Derouen, April Mosher, Kevin Park, Steve Read and Michael Hunt
Case Number: 2:2014cv01282
Filed: May 27, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: Lawrence K. Karlton
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 7/13/2020 GRANTING defendant's motion for summary judgment, ECFNo. 104 ; and DENYING plaintiff's motion to supplement the record, ECF No. 118 . The Clerk is directed to enter judgment in defendant's favor and CLOSE this case. CASE CLOSED (Becknal, R)
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 5/1/2019 IT IS SO ORDERED 118 Plaintiff's motion to supplement the record in opposition to summary judgment SUBMITTED on the briefs, the currently noticed hearing date of 5/31/2019 VACATED, the briefing schedule to remain on the currently set schedule. (Reader, L)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 2/5/19 ORDERING that the court's February 5, 2019 order 112 contains a typographical error. The court now AMENDS the order, replacing "defendant's reply is due February 8, 2019" with defendant's reply is due March 8, 2019." This amendment does not modify any other portion of the order. (Kaminski, H)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 112 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 2/4/19 CONTINUING the 104 Motion for Summary Judgment Hearing to 3/22/19 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller with defendant's Reply due by 2/8/19. The court DECLINES to adopt the parties' stipulation for plaintiff's counsel to appear by phone. (Coll, A)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 106 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 12/18/2018 EXTENDING the deadline for Defendant's reply in support of 104 Motion for Summary Judgment to 2/8/2019 and CONTINUING the hearing to 3/8/2019. (Huang, H)
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 9/24/18 DISMISSING Contreras' FMLA and ADA claims without leave to amend, as is her Rehabilitation Act claim, insofar as it arises from any alleged hearing impairment and insofar as it includes a disparate treatment claim. Defendant shall file an answer within 21 days. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 8/21/18 SETTING the following briefing and hearing Schedule: Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment 12/3/2018. Plaintiff's opposition 12/21/2018. Defendant's Reply 1/11/2019. Hearing 2/8/19 at 10:00 A.M. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
March 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 3/27/2018 GRANTING 47 , 50 , 54 Motions to Dismiss; However, Plaintiff is GRANTED leave to file a Second Amended Complaint within 30 days. (Fabillaran, J)
January 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 91 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 1/17/18, ORDERING that the Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Conference presently scheduled for 1/26/2018, be continued to a date to be determined after the three pending Motions to Dismiss are ruled on. (Kastilahn, A)
November 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 11/29/2017 SUBSTITUTING Mark T. Esper as defendant for Ryan D. McCarthy. (Zignago, K.)
November 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 11/22/2017 SUBSTITUTING Ryan D. McCarthy as defendant for John M. McHugh and Robert M. Speer. (Hunt, G)
October 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 10/4/2017 ORDERING 66 Plaintiff's substitution of counsel is APPROVED. Because neither all plaintiffs nor all defendants are proceeding without counsel after the substitution of plaintiff& #039;s counsel, this action is REFERRED to the assigned district judge for all further proceedings, except for discovery motions and matters otherwise appropriately referred to the assigned magistrate judge under the court Local Rules. All dates presently scheduled before Judge Newman, including the 10/26/2017 hearing (ECF No. 64 ) on defendants' motions to dismiss (ECF Nos. 47 , 50 , 54 ), are VACATED. (Reader, L) Modified on 10/4/2017 (Reader, L).
August 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 63 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 8/23/17: HEARING as to 47 , 54 Motions to Dismiss RESET for 10/26/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 25 (KJN) before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman. Opposition briefs will be due on or before October 5, 2017. Reply briefs will be due on or before October 19, 2017. (Kaminski, H)
January 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 1/26/2017 DIRECTING the Clerk to issue all process pursuant to F.R.Cv.P. Rule 4; FURTHER DIRECTING the Clerk of Court to sent the plaintiff one USM-285 form, one summons, a copy of the first amend ed complaint, and civil new case documents forthwith; ORDERING the plaintiff to submit to the U.S. Marshal within 14 days, one completed 13 , 14 Summons, one completed USM-285 form for each defendant, one copy of the 9 First Amended Complaint fo r each defendant, with an extra copy for the U.S. Marshal, and a copy of this Court's 15 Civil New Case Documents for each defendant and to file a statement with the court attesting to such service within 14 days thereafter; DIRECTING the U.S. Marshal to serve process without prepayment of costs within 90 days of receipt of the required information from the plaintiff; CAUTIONING the plaintiff that a failure to comply with this order may result in a recommendation that this action be dismissed. (cc: U.S. Marshal) (Michel, G.)
June 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 6/22/15 ORDERING that:Plaintiff's request for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, ECF No. 2 , is granted; Plaintiff's motion to amend, ECF No. 3 , is denied as unnecessary; and Plai ntiff is granted thirty days from the date of service of this order to file an amended complaint. The amended complaint must bear the docket number assigned to this case and must be labeled "First Amended Complaint." If plaintiff fails to file an amended complaint, the court will screen plaintiff's original complaint. (Becknal, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Contreras v. National Guard Bureau et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Graciela M. Contreras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Guard Bureau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank J Grass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles T Hagel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Baldwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Dana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louis Birdsong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Derrik Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberely Derouen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: April Mosher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Read
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?