Sokoloski et al v. PNC Bank NA
Plaintiff: John Sokoloski and Gail Sokoloski
Defendant: PNC Bank NA
Case Number: 2:2014cv01374
Filed: June 6, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Presiding Judge: William B. Shubb
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 11/12/15 ORDERING that this Action is DISMISSED with prejudice in its entirety. The Court shall retain jurisdiction to enforce the settlement agreement entered into between PNC and Plaintiffs on 10/30/15. Each party shall bear its, their, his or her own costs and attorneys' fees. CASE CLOSED. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
September 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER MODIFYING PRETRIAL DEADLINES signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 09/03/15 ORDERING that the deadline for initial designation of expert witnesses and reports is continued to 12/14/15; the deadline for designation of rebuttal expert witnesses and reports is continued to 01/11/16; and the deadline for filing all motions, except motions for continuances, temporary restraining orders or other emergency applications is continued to 02/08/16. (Benson, A)
August 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 30 STIPULATION and ORDER to Elect Referral of Action to VDRP 29 signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 8/14/2015. Case Referred to VDRP. (Kirksey Smith, K)
December 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATION and ORDER 22 signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 12/5/2014 extending the time for PNC to answer Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint to 12/12/2014. (Kirksey Smith, K)
November 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 11/18/2014 DENYING 14 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. (Kirksey Smith, K)
August 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 8/8/14. Amended complaint due within 21 days. (Manzer, C)
August 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMORANDUM and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 8/6/2014 ORDERING that Plaintiff's 6 Motion to Remand is DENIED. (Zignago, K.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sokoloski et al v. PNC Bank NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Sokoloski
Represented By: Robert Steven Gimblin, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gail Sokoloski
Represented By: Robert Steven Gimblin, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PNC Bank NA
Represented By: Joshua M. Bryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?