Ramnanan v. Ali et al
Plaintiff: |
Andre Ramnanan |
Defendant: |
N. Ali, Steward and Rosse |
Case Number: |
2:2014cv01441 |
Filed: |
June 16, 2014 |
Court: |
U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California |
Office: |
Sacramento Office |
County: |
Amador |
Presiding Judge: |
Carolyn K. Delaney |
Presiding Judge: |
Kimberly J. Mueller |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
May 21, 2015 |
Filing
26
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 5/21/15 denying 25 Motion to Appoint Counsel. (Dillon, M)
|
May 11, 2015 |
Filing
24
ORDER and WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM ISSUED signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 05/11/15 ORDERING the Custodian to produce Andre Ramnanan on 06/02/15 at 9:00 a.m. in courtroom 25 before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman. Custodian is ordered to notify the court of any changes in custody and to provide new custodian with a copy of this writ. Clerk shall serve a copy of this order and writ on the Custodian and Out-to-Court Desk. (cc: KJN and OTCD) (Plummer, M)
|
April 8, 2015 |
Filing
19
ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 4/7/15 ORDERING that the findings and recommendations filed March 10, 2015, are adopted as clarified by this order; and Defendants Ali and Rosse are dismissed. (Becknal, R)
|
March 10, 2015 |
Filing
14
ORDER, FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 3/9/2015 ORDERING that service is appropriate for Stewart; the Clerk shall send plaintiff forms for service to be completed and returned within 30 days, along with the Notice of Submission; AND RECOMMENDING that defendants Ali and Rosse be dismissed. Referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller; Objections due within 14 days. (Yin, K)
|
October 10, 2014 |
Filing
8
ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Andre Ramnanan signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 10/10/2014. CDCR shall collect an initial partial filing fee and thereafter the balance in monthly payments and forward t o the Clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. The Clerk is directed to serve this order and copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Director of CDCR. The Clerk shall also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: CDCR, Financial)(Yin, K)
|
June 24, 2014 |
Filing
3
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 6/23/2014 ORDERING plaintiff to submit, within 30 days, an affidavit in support of his request to proceed ifp, or the $400.00 filing fee; and the Clerk shall send plaintiff a new ifp application.(Yin, K)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?