McMenemy v. Flagship Financial Group, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Diana McMenemy and Michael McMenemy
Defendant: Flagship Financial Group, LLC, Colonial First Lending Group, Inc., Colonial First Business Development, LLC and Devin Jones
Case Number: 2:2014cv01482
Filed: February 18, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Nevada
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 145 DEFAULT JUDGMENT against Colonial First Lending Group, Inc. pursuant to order signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 8/16/2016. (Zignago, K.)
August 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 107 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 8/19/15. (Manzer, C)
August 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 105 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 8/7/2015 MODIFYING the 33 Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Order; ORDERING that all fact discovery be completed by 10/30/2015; ORDERING that all dispositive motions be filed by 2/23/2016 and that the hearing on such motions be held on 3/22/2016 at 09:30 AM; ORDERING that experts provide written reports ninety (90) days prior to trial; ORDERING that expert depositions be taken within thirty (30) days of receipt of the written report; ORDERING that the Joint Pretrial Statement be filed by 5/20/2016; CONTINUING the Final Pretrial Conference to 5/27/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before Judge John A. Mendez; CONTINUING the Jury Trial to 6/27/2016 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before Judge John A. Mendez. (Michel, G.)
April 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 04/14/15 ORDERING THAT the 75 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings is DENIED. (Benson, A)
March 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION 69 FOR CERTIFICATION OF RULING UNDER FRCP 54(b) signed by Judge John A. Mendez on March 12, 2015. This action will be stayed during the pendency of Plaintiffs appeal in the Ninth Circuit, but the stay will not take effect until Plaintiffs file a notice of appeal with this Court. Within 30 days of the Ninth Circuits decision on Plaintiffs likely appeal, the parties are ordered to file a joint status report in this matter. (Rivas, A)
October 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 10/9/2014 DENYING plaintiffs' 43 Motion for Relief under FRCP 60(b)(1) from 8/25/2014 40 Order denying Motion for Issuance of New Summons. Court further ORDERS that Mr. Winter SHOW CAUSE why he should not be sanctioned. Mr. Winter shall file a Declaration in response to Order within 10 days of its filing. (Marciel, M)
August 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 8/25/14 ORDERING that the motion for issuance of a new Summons to Colonial First Business Development, LLC is DENIED in its entirety; and Colonial First Business Development, LLC is DISMISSED, with prejudice. (Kastilahn, A)
June 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER TRANSFERRING Action to SACRAMENTO Division signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 6/20/2014. (Sant Agata, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McMenemy v. Flagship Financial Group, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flagship Financial Group, LLC
Represented By: Micah K Nilsson
Represented By: Jere B. Reneer, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colonial First Lending Group, Inc.
Represented By: Jody L. Winter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colonial First Business Development, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Devin Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diana McMenemy
Represented By: Patrick H Dwyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael McMenemy
Represented By: Patrick H Dwyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?