Randell v. Flagstar Bank, FSB et al
Plaintiff: Debra L. Randell
Defendant: Flagstar Bank, FSB and Green Tree Servicing, LLC
Case Number: 2:2014cv01575
Filed: July 3, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Shasta
Presiding Judge: Craig M. Kellison
Presiding Judge: Troy L. Nunley
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 (a) Fed. Question: Real Property
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 1/25/17 ORDERING that the the Pretrial Scheduling Order 32 is amended as follows: the last day to hear dispositive motions is 6/29/17, joint pre-trial statement due 8/17/17, Final Pretrial Confe rence SET for 8/24/2017 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley, Jury Trial SET for 10/23/2017 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley, and the trial is estimated to last 3-4 days. (Kastilahn, A)
December 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 32 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 12/4/15 ORDERING that all Discovery shall be completed by 8/18/2016. Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 10/20/2016. All dispositive motions, except motions for continuance s, temporary restraining orders or other emergency applications, shall be heard no later than 2/23/2017. The Final Pretrial Conference is SET for 5/18/2017 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. The parties shall file , not later than 5/11/2017, a Joint Final Pretrial Conference Statement. A Jury Trial is SET for 7/17/2017 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. The parties estimate a trial length of three to four (3-4) days. (Kastilahn, A)
May 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 4 Motion to Dismiss and granting in part and denying in part 14 Motion to Dismiss signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 5/6/15. (Kaminski, H)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Randell v. Flagstar Bank, FSB et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra L. Randell
Represented By: Jeremy Scott Golden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flagstar Bank, FSB
Represented By: Frederick A. Haist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Green Tree Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Harold Ricky Jones, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?