White et al v. City of Vallejo
Plaintiff: Christopher White, Zerita White, G'Shelle White and Dantrell Stevens
Defendant: City of Vallejo
Case Number: 2:2014cv01603
Filed: July 8, 2014
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER and FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 3/23/2017 VACATING all future hearing dates; DENYING 69 Motion for Summary Judgment, without prejudice, as moot; RECOMMENDING that the 8 First Amended Complaint be dismissed without prejudice and that this action be closed; REFERRING this matter to Judge John A. Mendez; ORDERING that any objections be filed and served within fourteen days. (Michel, G.)
February 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 2/23/2017 ORDERING, within 14 days, plaintiffs shall SHOW CAUSE in writing as to why this case should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution; the 3/3/2017 hearing on defendants' motion for su mmary judgment is CONTINUED to 4/7/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 27 (DB) before Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes; on or before 3/24/2017, plaintiffs shall file statements of opposition or non-opposition to defendants' motion for summary judgment; and plaintiffs are cautioned that the failure to timely comply with this order may result in a recommendation that this case be dismissed. (Yin, K)
October 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER re protective order signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 10/7/16. (Kaminski, H)
August 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER adopting in full 50 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS, signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 8/31/16. Defendants' 38 motion to dismiss is DENIED without prejudice, as having been rendered moot. Plaintiff Dantrell Stevens is DISMISSED from this action. (Kastilahn, A)
June 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 50 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 6/28/16 RECOMMENDING that Defendants' motion to dismiss 38 ) be denied, without prejudice, as having been rendered moot; and Plaintiff Dantrell Stevens be dismissed from this action. Matter referred to District Judge John A. Mendez. Within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations, any party may file written objections with the court and serve a copy on all parties. (Kastilahn, A)
June 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 6/15/16 discharging 44 order to show cause. (Kaminski, H)
May 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 5/20/2016 ORDERING that defendants' 39 Motion to Compel is GRANTED. Plaintiff Christopher White shall produce responsive documents within 21 days of the date of this order, or file a st atement that he is no longer pursuing damages for lost income in this action. Within 14 days of the date of this order, plaintiff Christopher White shall file a response as to why he should not be sanctioned in the amount of $250 for failing to file a timely opposition, or a statement of non-opposition, and for failing to appear at the 5/19/2016 hearing. If plaintiff Christopher White fails to file a timely response to this order the undersigned will recommend that plaintiff Christopher White be dismissed fro this action. (Zignago, K.)
May 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 05/13/16 ORDERING that, within 14 days, plaintiff Dantrell Stevens shall SHOW CAUSE in writing as to why he should not be dismissed from this action for a lack of prosecution. Failure to timely file the required writing will result in a recommendation that plaintiff Dantrell Stevens be dismissed from this action. The 05/19/16 hearing of 38 defendants' Motion to Dismiss is VACATED. (Benson, A) Modified on 5/16/2016 (Benson, A).
September 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER SETTING STATUS (PRETRIAL SCHEDULING) CONFERENCE signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 09/14/15 ORDERING that a Scheduling Conference is SET for 10/16/2015 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 27 (DAD) before Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd. Plaintiffs shall file status reports by 10/02/15; defendants shall file a status report by 10/09/15. (Benson, A)
June 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 06/04/15 ordering the clerk of the court is directed to issue process and to send plaintiffs an instruction sheet for service of process by the U.S. Marshal, 3 USM-285 forms, a summons form and an en dorsed copy of plaintiff's amended complaint filed 08/29/14 8 . Within 30 days after this order is served, plaintiffs shall submit to the United States Marshal 3 properly completed USM-285 forms, 3 properly completed summons forms, and the num ber of copies of the endorsed amended complaint and of this order required by the United States Marshal; the required documents shall be submitted directly to the United States Marshal either by personal delivery or by mail to: United States Marshals Service, 501 I Street, Suite 5600, Sacramento, CA 95814. Within 10 days after submitting the required materials to the U.S. Marshals Service, plaintiffs shall file with this court a declaration stating the date on which they submitted the required documents to the United States Marshal. Within 30 days after receiving the necessary materials from plaintiffs, the United States Marshal is directed to serve process on defendants Knight, Long and Martinez without prepayment of costs. The clerk of the court is directed to serve a copy of this order on the U.S. Marshal. (cc: USM) (Plummer, M)
January 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 1/23/2015 ORDERING that defendant SHALL FILE a notice of related cases within five days of the service of this order. The status conference now set for 1/28/2015, is hereby VACATED, to be reset following determination of whether this latter filed case should be reassigned. (Zignago, K.)
September 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 9/19/2014 GRANTING plaintiffs' 4 5 6 7 Motions to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Service is appropriate for defendant City of Vallejo. Clerk shall send plaintiffs 1 Summons, 1 USM-285 form, an instructions sheet, a copy of 1 8 Complaint(s), and New Case Documents for Judge Claire. Within 15 days, plaintiff directed to supply U.S. Marshal with all information needed to effect service of process and file a Statement with Court that said documents have been submitted. [cc: U.S. Marshal Services] (Marciel, M)
July 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 7/31/14 ORDERING that Plaintiff Christopher White's MOTION to proceed in forma pauperis 2 is DENIED without prejudice to its renewal. The remaining three Plaintiffs must also file motions to proceed in forma pauperis or, in the alternative, the $400.00 filing fee must be paid in full by any or all of the Plaintiffs. Failure to comply with this order may result in a recommendation for dismissal.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White et al v. City of Vallejo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zerita White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G'Shelle White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dantrell Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Vallejo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?