Global Comminity Monitor, et al v. Mammoth Pacific, LP et al

Plaintiff: Global Comminity Monitor, Laborers' International Union of North America Local Union No. 783, Randal Sipes, Jr. and Russel Covington
Defendant: Mammoth Pacific, LP, Ormat Nevada, Inc. and Ormat Technologies, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2014cv01612
Filed: July 8, 2014
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Referring Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42:7413
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 7, 2016 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 7/6/2016 ORDERING that Plaintiff Global Community Monitor is DISMISSED with prejudice, pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), each party to bear its own costs and fees. (Reader, L)
June 20, 2016 63 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 06/17/16 ORDERING that Court SETS the following briefing schedule for 59 plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Amend Their Complaint: filed: 06/14/16; opposition: 06/28/16; reply: 07/07/16; hearing: 07/14/16 at 2:00 p.m.; the Dispositive motion cutoff is EXTENDED to 10/06/16 and SETS the briefing schedule for dispositive motions as follows: motions filed: 08/11/16; oppositions and any cross motions: 09/01/16; reply a nd opposition to cross-motions: 09/15/16; reply on any cross-motions: 09/29/16; hearing: 10/06/16 at 2:00 p.m.; if no decision has been entered by 08/05/16 on plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend, the dispositive dates shall be EXTENDED; all other deadlines established in the Court's Pretrial Scheduling Order remain in effect. (A. Benson)
May 16, 2016 54 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER regarding discovery of financial information from Defendants signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 5/13/2016. (Zignago, K.)
May 9, 2016 52 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 5/9/16 ORDERING the court APPROVES the parties' stipulation regarding the discovery of financial information from defendants, as outlined above. However, the parties are a dvised that, to the extent that the parties agreed to produce documents or conduct other discovery beyond the deadlines outlined in the operative pretrial scheduling order, such an agreement will not be enforced by the court through formal motion practice after the applicable discovery deadline(s) have passed. As such, the parties are strongly encouraged to seek modification of the deadlines in the pretrial scheduling order from Judge England to formally facilitate such discovery efforts. Such modification may be sought by virtue of an appropriate stipulation and proposed order, setting forth good cause for modification of the scheduling order. (Becknal, R)
October 14, 2015 50 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying defendants' 34 Motion to Dismiss, signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., on 10/13/15. (Kastilahn, A)
September 16, 2015 46 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER re 38 Motion for Protective Order signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 9/16/2015 ORDERING discovery STAYED until Judge England issues a decision of Ormat's Dispositive Motion. (Zignago, K.)
September 10, 2015 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 09/10/15 ORDERING that no later than 09/17/15, the parties shall file with the court a stipulation and proposed order regarding a partial stay of discovery in accordance with this order. If the parties are ultimately unable to agree on an appropriate stipulation after exhausting good-faith meet-and-confer efforts, the parties shall contact the undersigned's courtroom deputy clerk to schedule a further telephonic conference. By way of this order, the court expresses no opinion concerning the merits of the pending motion to dismiss, which will be resolved by the district judge. (Benson, A)
August 20, 2015 32 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and 30 PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 8/18/2015. Court staff shall not be required to execute any Disclosure Agreement, nor shall Court be required to return or destroy any copies of confidential docume nts filed or lodged with it in this case. Pursuant to Local Rule 141.1(f), the Court will not retain jurisdiction over enforcement of terms of this Protective Order after action is terminated. Nothing in this Order shall limit testimony of parties or non-parties, or use of certain documents or information, at any Court Hearing or Trial such determinations will only be made by Court at Hearing or Trial, or upon an appropriate Motion. (Marciel, M)
May 11, 2015 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 5/8/15 DENYING 14 Motion to Dismiss and GRANTING in part and DENYING in part 17 Motion to Dismiss; Plaintiff's case proceeds on the eighth cause of action only. Amended complaint due within 20 days. (Manzer, C)
September 30, 2014 20 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 9/29/14 ORDERING the two pending Motion to Dismiss 14 17 are RESET for 11/13/14 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Chief Judge Morrison C. England Jr. (Becknal, R)
July 31, 2014 12 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 7/30/14 ORDERING 1. Plaintiffs' electronic transmittal of documents to Defendants' counsel on July 10, 2014 constitutes effective service of the following documents on Defendants: (1) Plaintiffs' Complaint; (2) Civil Cover Sheet; (3) Summons issued by the Court; (4) Notice of Availability of Voluntary Dispute Resolution; (5) Order Requiring Joint Status Report; and, (6) Notice of Availability of a Magis trate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction and Appeal Instructions and Consent or Declination to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. 2. Defendants' Answer or other response to Plaintiffs' Complaint is due on or before September 8, 2104. (Becknal, R)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Global Comminity Monitor, et al v. Mammoth Pacific, LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Global Comminity Monitor
Represented By: Richard Drury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laborers' International Union of North America Local Union No. 783
Represented By: Richard Drury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randal Sipes, Jr.
Represented By: Richard Drury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russel Covington
Represented By: Richard Drury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mammoth Pacific, LP
Represented By: Matthew Bradley Hippler
Represented By: Steven G. Jones, PHV(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Emily C. Schilling, PHV(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ormat Nevada, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Bradley Hippler
Represented By: Steven G. Jones, PHV(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Emily C. Schilling, PHV(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ormat Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Bradley Hippler
Represented By: Steven G. Jones, PHV(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Emily C. Schilling, PHV(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?