Dietle v. Miranda, et al.
Plaintiff: Darrell Dietle
Defendant: Rafael Miranda and Dorothy Swingle
Case Number: 2:2014cv01728
Filed: July 17, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Lassen
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 3/22/17 ORDERING that defendant's 42 Bill of Costs in the amount of $775.00 is DENIED without prejudice to its being renewed after plaintiff's appeal is resolved. (Kastilahn, A)
March 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 3/7/17: Plaintiff is ORDERED to file a response to the Bill of Costs within ten (10) days from the date of this Order. (Kaminski, H)
February 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 2/22/2017 ADOPTING 35 Findings and Recommendations in full and GRANTING 27 Motion for Summary Judgment. Judgment entered for Defendant. CASE CLOSED. (Donati, J)
February 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 2/2/2017 DENYING plaintiff's 36 motion for polygraph. Any further pro se motions will be DISREGARDED. The Clerk shall serve a courtesy copy of this order on plaintiff at SVSP. (Yin, K)
January 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 1/26/2017 RECOMMENDING defendant's 27 motion for summary judgment be granted; and judgment be entered for defendant. Referred to Judge Willam B. Shubb; Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Yin, K)
September 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 08/31/16 ordering plaintiff shall have until 9/07/16 to file an amended response to defendant's statement of undisputed facts that complies with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 56(c) and Local r ule 260(b). Defendant shall have until 9/14/16 to file a reply to the amended response. The 09/07/16 hearing on defendant's motion for summary judgment is vacated. ( Motion Hearing re-set for 9/21/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26 (AC) before Magistrate Judge Allison Claire.) (Plummer, M)
December 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 12/23/2015 SANCTIONING Plaintiff's counsel of record, Julia M. Young $250.00, payable to the Clerk of Court within ten days; SETTING a Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Conference for 2/10/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26 (AC) before Magistrate Judge Allison Claire; ORDERING the parties to confer, as required by F.R.Cv.P. Rule 26(f), prior to the Status Conference; ORDERING the parties to file status reports fourteen days prior to the Statu s Conference; REMINDING the parties that the plaintiff is not exempt from the initial disclosure rules and that motions are to be noticed in accordance with the requirements for Local Rule 230(a)-(k); FURTHER REMINDING the parties that a United States Magistrate Judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this action. (cc: Financial Sacramento) (Michel, G.)
November 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 11/19/15 ordering that within 10 days of the date of this order, plaintiff must show cause why this case should not be dismissed for failure to effect timely service and to comply with the court's 8/17/15 order. (Plummer, M)
May 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 5/22/2015 ORDERING that claims against defendant Swingle and Doe defendants are DISMISSED with leave to amend within 30 days. Plaintiff is not obliged to amend his complaint. The allegations in t he pleading are sufficient to state claims against defendant Miranda.If plaintiff elets not to amend the complaint, then within 30 days he must file either (1) a notice of intent to serve defendant Miranda within 60 days or (2) proof or waiver of service of process for defendant Miranda.(Yin, K)
January 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 12/31/14 ORDERING that the recommendation that this case be dismissed 11 is WITHDRAWN; and the court will screen the complaint in due course.(Dillon, M)
November 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER, FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 11/21/14 ORDERING that the Clerk of the Court make a random assignment of a district judge to this case. It is RECOMMENDED that the Clerk of the Court make a random assignment of a district judge to this case. Randomly assigned and referred to Judge William B. Shubb; Objections to F&R due within 21 days.(Dillon, M)
October 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 10/6/14 ORDERING that Plaintiffs in forma pauperis Application 8 is DENIED without prejudice; The Clerk of the Court is directed to send plaintiff a new Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis By a Prisoner; Plaintiff shall submit, within 30 days from the date of this order, a completed and signed Application form provided by the Clerk of the Court; Plaintiff shall also submit, within 30 days from the date of this order, either a certified copy of his prison trust account statement for the six month period immediately preceding the filing of the complaint, or the equivalent institutional certificate, or both if possible.(Dillon, M)
August 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 08/28/14 granting 6 Motion for Extension of time. Plaintiff Darrell Dietle shall have his completed in forma pauperis affidavit filed with the court no later than 09/28/14. (Plummer, M)
July 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 7/28/2014 ORDERING Plaintiff shall submit, within thirty days from the date of this order, a completedaffidavit in support of his request to proceed in forma pauperis on the form provided by the Cle rk; Clerk is directed to send plaintiff a new Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis By a Prisoner; and of Court; Plaintiff shall submit, within thirty days from the date of this order, a certified copy ofhis prison trust account statement for the six month period immediately preceding the filing of the complaint. Plaintiffs failure to comply with this order will result in a recommendation that this action be dismissed without prejudice. (Waggoner, D)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dietle v. Miranda, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darrell Dietle
Represented By: Julia Mary Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rafael Miranda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dorothy Swingle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?