Kennard v. San Joaquin County et al
Plaintiff: Thomas O. Kennard
Defendant: San Joaquin County and Steven Moore
Case Number: 2:2014cv01750
Filed: July 24, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 31 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 02/10/16 ordering that the entire action is dismissed as to defendants San Joaquin County and Steven Moore with prejudice. Each side is to bear it's own costs and attorneys fees. CASE CLOSED. (Plummer, M)
January 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 1/26/16 ordering the stipulation and proposed order submitted by the parties on 1/25/16 28 is denied without prejudice to the filing, within 30 days, of an amended stipulation and proposed order that clarifies the basis for the parties' agreement, identifies all parties for who dismissal is sought, and indicates whether the parties are requesting dismissal of the entire action. (Plummer, M)
November 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 11/13/2015 and agreed between the parties to modify the Discovery and Scheduling Order by EXTENDING the dispositive motion deadline to 1/13/2016. (Yin, K)
October 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 25 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 10/26/15 ordering that plaintiff's 3rd cause of action for violations of procedural due process under the 14th amendment of the United States be dismissed with prejudice. (Plummer, M)
September 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 9/10/15 ORDERING that upon the date of service of this order, defense counsel shall promptly inform the deposition officer that the transcript of plaintiff's 7/16/15 deposition is not yet read y to be finalized. Defense counsel shall also promptly make the necessary arrangements with appropriate CSH staff to facilitate plaintiff's review of the preliminary transcript of his deposition, plaintiff's completion of the Errata pages, and plaintiff's signature on the Declaration under Penalty of Perjury form. These matters shall be completed as soon as possible but no later than 30 days after the filing date of this order. Upon full compliance with this order, including the completion of plaintiff's review and the return of all documents to the deposition officer, defense counsel shall file and serve a statement of compliance. Defense counsel is reminded that plaintiff does not have access to the court's electronic filing system or docket, and therefore service of all documents on plaintiff must be by mail or hand delivered, and each proof of service must be filed with the court. (Kastilahn, A)
June 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 6/1/2015 ORDERING defendant Moore shall pay to the US Marshal the sum of $190.38, within 14 days, unless within that time defendant files a written statement SHOWING GOOD CAUSE for his failure to waive service. The Clerk shall serve a copy of this order on the USM. (cc: USM) (Yin, K)
April 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 04/20/15 ORDERING that defendants shall serve plaintiff with a copy of their answer and file a certificate of service with the court within 7 days. The 04/06/15 Discovery and Scheduling Order is AMENDED as follows: the discovery deadline is EXTENDED to 08/28/15; the dispositive motion deadline is EXTENDED to 11/13/15. (Benson, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kennard v. San Joaquin County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas O. Kennard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Joaquin County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?