Rice v. Obama et al
Petitioner: Eric Dwight Rice
Respondent: Barrack Obama and Eric Holder
Case Number: 2:2014cv01784
Filed: July 28, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Amador
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 3/25/2015 ORDERING that documents filed by petitioner since the closing date will be DISREGARDED and no orders will issue in response to future filings. (Yin, K)
February 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 2/24/15 ORDERING that plaintiff's 11 motion is DENIED.(Dillon, M)
September 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 9/10/14 DENYING 9 Motion for Reconsideration. (Dillon, M)
August 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 08/13/14 granting 2 Motion to Proceed IFP. The petition is dismissed without prejudice. CASE CLOSED. (Plummer, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rice v. Obama et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Eric Dwight Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Barrack Obama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Eric Holder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?