King v. Wang et al
Plaintiff: David King
Defendant: Wang, L. D. Zamora, Beza, Harding and California Department of Corrections & Rehabilitation
Case Number: 2:2014cv01817
Filed: August 1, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 65 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 2/05/19 RECOMMENDING that defendant's motion for summary judgment 53 be granted. Motion for Summary Judgment 53 referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
July 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 7/13/2018 DENYING plaintiff's 56 motion for appointment of counsel; and DENYING plaintiff's 57 request for a court-appointed expert. (Yin, K)
February 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 2/12/2018 GRANTING 50 Motion to Modify the Discovery and Scheduling Order. The deadline for the filing of dispositive motions is extended to May 30, 2018. (Fabillaran, J)
October 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER ADOPTING 46 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS in full signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 10/03/17 DENYING defendant's 42 Motion to Dismiss; Defendant is directed to file an answer within 10 days. (Benson, A.)
July 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 46 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 07/26/17 recommending that defendants motion to dismiss be denied, and defendant be directed to file an answer within ten (10) days from the date that these findings and recommendations are adopted. MOTION to DISMISS 42 referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
June 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 06/07/17 ordering that defendant Nurse Wang shall file a responsive pleading to the second amended complaint within 14 days from the date of this order. (Plummer, M)
April 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 03/31/17 ordering that the Clerk's Office shall send plaintiff a blank civil rights complaint form. Within 30 days from the date of service of this order, plaintiff must either: File a second amended complaint curing the deficiencies identified in this order, or notify the court in writing that he does not wish to file a second amended complaint and he is willing to proceed only on the claims found to be cognizable in this order. (Plummer, M)
May 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 5/27/16 DENYING 36 Motion to Appoint Counsel. (Dillon, M)
February 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 02/25/16 granting 22 Motion to Dismiss. The complaint 1 is dismissed with leave to amend. Plaintiff is granted 30 days from the date of service of this order to file an amended complaint. (Plummer, M)
April 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER VACATING 14 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 04/20/15 and ORDERING Clerk to send plaintiff one USM form to be completed and returned within 30 days. (Benson, A)
March 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER, FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 3/24/2015 ORDERING the Clerk to randomly assign a district judge to this action; AND RECOMMENDING that this action be dismissed without prejudice. Assigned and referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller; Objections due within 14 days. (Yin, K)
January 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 1/5/15 ORDERING that the Clerk of the Court is directed to send plaintiff one blank USM-285 form; Within 30 days, plaintiff shall submit to the court the completed USM-285 form required to effect service. The Clerk of the Court is directed to term plaintiffs Amended Complaint. (ECF No. 12 )(Dillon, M)
November 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 11/5/14 ORDERING the Director of the CDC to collect and forward payment from the trust account of David King and forward payment to the court until the balance is paid in full. Clerk of the Court is directed to serve a copy of this order and a copy of plaintiff's signed in forma pauperis affidavit to the Director of the CDC; and the Clerk of the Court is further directed to serve a copy of this order on the Financial Department of the court. (cc CDC, Financial). (Dillon, M)
August 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 8/12/2014 ORDERING plaintiff to submit, within 30 days, a certified copy of his prison trust account statement for the six-month period immediately preceding the filing of his complaint.(Yin, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: King v. Wang et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. D. Zamora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Department of Corrections & Rehabilitation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?