Johnson v. Khan, et al
Plaintiff: Scott Johnson
Defendant: Saleem A. Khan and K-B Wireless, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2014cv01823
Filed: August 4, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: Troy L. Nunley
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 10/11/18 CONTINUING the Judgment Debtor Examination RE: Enforcement of Judgment of MohammadYasir Khan, CEO K-B Wireless, Inc., to 1/16/19 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (EFB) before Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan. (Becknal, R)
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 7/30/2018 ORDERING a Judgment Debtor Exam re: Pltf's Motion to Enforce Judgment 54 as to Mohammad Yasir Khan set for 10/10/2018 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (EFB) before Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan. (Cannarozzi, N)
December 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 12/5/17 ORDERING that the Judgment Debtor Exam for Saleem A Khan scheduled for 12/6/17 is VACATED. (Becknal, R)
September 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 9/21/17, ORDERING that Saleem A. Khan Appear for Examination Re: Enforcement of Judgment on 12/6/2017 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (EFB) before Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan. (Kastilahn, A)
July 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 712/17, ORDERING that the Court hereby enters judgment in favor of Plaintiff in the amount of $11,143.84. (Kastilahn, A)
September 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 9/1/15 ORDERING that the hearing on Plaintiff's MOTION for Rule 37 Sanctions 29 is CONTINUED to 9/16/2015. Defendants' counsel shall show cause, in writing, no later tha n 9/9/2015, why he should not be sanctioned in the amount of $500 for his failure to file an opposition or statement of non-opposition to the pending motion as required by Local Rule 251(e). Defendants shall file an opposition to the motion, or a statement of non-opposition thereto, no later than 9/9/15. Plaintiff may file a reply to defendants' opposition, if any, on or before 9/14/15. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
July 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 7/27/2015 ORDERING that Plaintiff's 15 and 23 Motions to Compel are GRANTED. Defendants shall produce documents responsive to plaintiffs Requests for Production of Documents, Set One and Two, within 7 days of the date of this order. Within 7 days of this order, defendants shall pay plaintiff $2,300 for the reasonable expenses incurred in bringing its motions to compel. (Zignago, K.)
May 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 5/7/15 ORDERING that Defendants shall show cause, in writing, on or before 5/27/15, why sanctions should not be imposed for their failure to appear at the 5/6/15 hearing. Failure to comply with this order may result in a recommendation that defendants' answer be stricken and their default entered. (Meuleman, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Khan, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Johnson
Represented By: Phyl Grace
Represented By: Mark D. Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saleem A. Khan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K-B Wireless, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?