Safari Club International v. Harris et al
Plaintiff: Safari Club International
Defendant: Charlton H. Bonham, Kamala D. Harris and Kamala Harris
Amicus Curiae: Humane Society of the United States and Fund for Animals
Case Number: 2:2014cv01856
Filed: August 6, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Referring Judge: John A Mendez
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 7, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2017 Filing 68 USCA MANDATE as to #64 Notice of Appeal filed by Safari Club International. The decision of the District Court is AFFIRMED. (Fabillaran, J)
November 15, 2017 Filing 67 USCA MEMORANDUM as to #64 Notice of Appeal filed by Safari Club International. The decision of the District Court is AFFIRMED. (Fabillaran, J)
March 3, 2016 Filing 66 USCA CASE NUMBER 16-15255 for #64 Notice of Appeal filed by Safari Club International. (Zignago, K.)
February 19, 2016 Filing 65 APPEAL PROCESSED to Ninth Circuit re #64 Notice of Appeal filed by Safari Club International. Notice of Appeal filed *2/18/2016*, Complaint filed *8/6/2014* and Appealed Order / Judgment filed *1/21/2016*. Court Reporter: *n/a*. *Fee Status: Paid on 2/18/2016 in the amount of $505.00* (Attachments: #1 Appeal Information) (Benson, A)
February 18, 2016 Filing 64 NOTICE of APPEAL by Safari Club International. (Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0972-6322564) (Burdin, Douglas)
January 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 63 JUDGMENT dated *1/21/2016* pursuant to order signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 1/20/2016. CASE CLOSED. (Zignago, K.)
January 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 1/20/2016 GRANTING #61 Unopposed Motion for Entry of Final Judgment. (Zignago, K.)
January 19, 2016 Filing 61 MOTION UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT by Safari Club International. Motion Hearing set for 2/23/2016 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Burdin, Douglas)
January 8, 2016 Filing 60 MINUTE ORDER: In view of the reassignment of this action to Judge Mendez, the scheduling conference date of 3/14/2016 is ordered vacated. (TEXT ENTRY ONLY) (Vine, H)
January 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER REQUIRING JOINT STATUS REPORT (Attachments: #1 Order re Filing Requirements) (Donati, J)
January 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.: Due to the senior status of District Judge *Garland E. Burrell, Jr.*, this action is reassigned to *Judge John A. Mendez* for all further proceedings. (Kastilahn, A)
January 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 1/5/16 ORDERING that Defendants' MOTION to DISMISS #42 is GRANTED. However, Plaintiff is GRANTED fourteen (14) days leave from the date on which this order is filed to file an Amended Complaint addressing the referenced deficiencies in any dismissed claim. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
December 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 56 MINUTE ORDER: The pretrial scheduling conference, currently set for 1/19/16, is rescheduled for 3/14/16 at 9:00 a.m. A joint status report shall be filed fourteen days prior to the hearing. Ordered by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 12/18/15. (Furstenau, S)
December 18, 2015 Filing 55 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Postponing Filing of Status Report and Pretrial Scheduling Conference by Safari Club International. (Burdin, Douglas)
October 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 54 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. on 10/20/2015 CONTINUING the Final Pretrial Conference to 1/19/2016 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (GEB) before Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr.; ORDERING that a joint status report be filed fourteen days prior to the hearing. (Michel, G.)
October 20, 2015 Filing 53 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for POSTPONING FILING OF STATUS REPORT AND PRETRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Safari Club International. (Burdin, Douglas)
September 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 52 MINUTE ORDER: The Motion to Dismiss, scheduled for hearing on 9/28/15, is submitted without oral argument. There will not be a hearing on 9/28/15, and no appearance is necessary. re #42 Motion to Dismiss. Ordered by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 9/24/15. (Furstenau, S)
September 21, 2015 Filing 51 REPLY in support of #42 Motion to Dismiss by Kamala D. Harris. (Gordon, Alexandra) Modified on 9/22/2015 (Michel, G.).
September 14, 2015 Filing 50 OPPOSITION by Safari Club International to #42 Motion to Dismiss. (Burdin, Douglas)
August 31, 2015 Filing 49 UNOPPOSED REQUEST FOR ADDITIONAL ARGUMENT TIME at the Motion Hearing on #42 Motion to Dismiss by Safari Club International. (Burdin, Douglas) Modified on 9/1/2015 (Michel, G.).
August 24, 2015 Filing 48 REQUEST for JUDICIAL NOTICE in Opposition to #42 Motion to Dismiss by Safari Club International. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M)(Burdin, Douglas) Modified on 8/24/2015 (Benson, A).
July 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. on 7/15/15 ORDERING that AMICI'S MOTION for leave to file an amicus curiae brief #43 is GRANTED. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
July 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. on 7/14/2015 APPROVING the #45 Stipulation to Adjudicate #43 Motion for Leave to Appear as Amici Curiae on the parties' stated positions and the Memorandum submitted in support of the Motion; VACATING the Motion Hearing on #43 Motion for Leave to Appear as Amici Curiae. (Michel, G.)
July 13, 2015 Filing 45 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER re #43 Motion for Leave to Appear as Amici Curiae for adjudication of motion on the record and briefs by Fund for Animals, Humane Society of the United States. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Sears, Hallie) Modified on 7/14/2015 (Meuleman, A).
July 6, 2015 Filing 44 STATEMENT of NON-OPPOSITION by Safari Club International to #43 Motion for Leave to Appear as Amici Curiae. (Burdin, Douglas) Modified on 7/8/2015 (Marciel, M)
June 26, 2015 Filing 43 MOTION Leave to Appear as Amici Curiae by Fund for Animals, Humane Society of the United States. Attorney Sears, Hallie G added. Motion Hearing set for 7/27/2015 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (GSA) before Judge Garland E. Burrell Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of William Yeates, #2 Proposed Amicus Brief, #3 Proposed Request for Judicial Notice, #4 Proposed Order, #5 Proof of Service)(Sears, Hallie)
June 17, 2015 Filing 42 MOTION to DISMISS #38 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by defendants. Motion Hearing set for 9/28/2015 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (GEB) before Judge Garland E. Burrell Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice and Declaration of Alexandra Robert Gordon, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Proposed Order granting Motion, #4 Proof of Service) (Gordon, Alexandra) Modified on 6/18/2015 (Marciel, M)
May 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 41 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 5/29/15: The pretrial scheduling conference is rescheduled for 12/7/2015 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (GEB) before Judge Garland E. Burrell Jr.. A joint status report shall be filed fourteen days prior to the hearing. (Kaminski, H)
May 28, 2015 Filing 40 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Changing Scheduling Conference and Joint Status Report Dates by Safari Club International. (Burdin, Douglas)
May 27, 2015 Filing 39 STIPULATION Re Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to First Amended Complaint by Charlton H. Bonham, Kamala D. Harris. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Gordon, Alexandra)
May 13, 2015 Filing 38 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Charlton H. Bonham, Kamala D. Harris by Safari Club International.(Burdin, Douglas)
April 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. on 4/28/2015 GRANTING #15 Motion to Dismiss; GRANTING the plaintiff fourteen (14) days leave to file a First Amended Complaint addressing the deficiencies in any dismissed claim. (Michel, G.)
April 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MINUTE ORDER: The Motion to Dismiss, scheduled for hearing on 4/20/15, is submitted without oral argument. There will not be a hearing on 4/20/15, and no appearance is necessary. re # 15 Motion to Dismiss, Ordered by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 4/16/15. (Furstenau, S)
March 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 35 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 3/30/15. The Final Pretrial Conference is reset for 6/22/2015 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (GEB) before Judge Garland E. Burrell Jr. Joint status report due no later than 14 days prior to conference. (Manzer, C)
March 27, 2015 Filing 34 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Changing Scheduling Conference and Joint Status Report Dates by Safari Club International. (Burdin, Douglas)
March 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MINUTE ORDER: The Motion to Dismiss, scheduled for hearing on 3/30/15, is rescheduled for 4/20/15 at 9:00 a.m. re # 15 Motion to Dismiss, Ordered by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 3/25/15. (Furstenau, S)
March 23, 2015 Filing 32 REPLY by Safari Club International re # 28 Request for Judicial Notice. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Burdin, Douglas)
March 23, 2015 Filing 31 REPLY by Charlton H. Bonham, Kamala D. Harris re # 15 Motion to Dismiss. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Gordon, Alexandra)
March 16, 2015 Filing 30 OPPOSITION by Safari Club International to # 15 Motion to Dismiss. (Burdin, Douglas)
March 9, 2015 Filing 29 OBJECTIONS by Defendants Charlton H. Bonham, Kamala D. Harris to # 28 Request for Judicial Notice. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Gordon, Alexandra)
February 27, 2015 Filing 28 REQUEST for JUDICIAL NOTICE by Safari Club International. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Proposed Order)(Burdin, Douglas)
January 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. on 1/16/2015 ORDERING # 26 Defendants Motion to Dismiss hearing is CONTINUED to 3/30/2015 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (GEB) before Judge Garland E. Burrell Jr. # 15 ; Plaintiff's opposition due by 3/16/2015, and defendants' reply by 3/23/2015. (Reader, L)
January 15, 2015 Filing 26 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Changing Hearing Date and Briefing Schedule on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by Charlton H. Bonham, Kamala D. Harris. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Gordon, Alexandra)
January 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 1/13/15: Motion for leave to file an amicus brief is GRANTED # 18 . HEARING as to # 15 Motion to Dismiss RESET for 2/17/2015 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (GEB) before Judge Garland E. Burrell Jr.. (Kaminski, H)
January 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MINUTE ORDER: The Motion to File Amici Brief, scheduled for hearing on 1/20/15, is submitted without oral argument. There will not be a hearing on 1/20/15, and no appearance is necessary. re # 18 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Ordered by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 1/9/15. (Furstenau, S)
January 9, 2015 Filing 23 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for adjudication of motion on the record and briefs re # 18 MOTION Leave to Appear as Amici Curiae by Fund for Animals, Humane Society of the United States. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service Proof of Service)(Brandt, Peter)
January 9, 2015 Filing 22 REPLY by Humane Society of the United States to RESPONSE to # 18 MOTION Leave to Appear as Amici Curiae. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service Proof of Service)(Brandt, Peter)
January 6, 2015 Filing 21 OPPOSITION by Safari Club International to # 18 MOTION Leave to Appear as Amici Curiae. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Denying Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief)(Burdin, Douglas)
December 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 20 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 12/17/14: Added attorney Hallie G Sears, PHV for Humane Society of the United States. (Kaminski, H)
December 17, 2014 Filing 19 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Fund for Animals, Humane Society of the United States for attorney Hallie G. Sears to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0972-5661810) (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Brandt, Peter)
December 17, 2014 Filing 18 MOTION Leave to Appear as Amici Curiae by Humane Society of the United States, Fund for Animals. Attorney Brandt, Peter Alfred added. Motion Hearing set for 1/20/2015 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (GEB) before Judge Garland E. Burrell Jr.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Amicus Brief, # 3 Proposed Request for Judicial Notice, # 4 Proposed Order, # 5 Proof of Service)(Brandt, Peter)
October 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 10/16/2014 ORDERING the # 15 Motion to Dismiss hearing CONTINUED to 2/2/2015 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (GEB) before Judge Garland E. Burrell Jr and the Scheduling Conference CONTINUED to 4/20/2015 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (GEB) before Judge Garland E. Burrell Jr. (Donati, J)
October 16, 2014 Filing 16 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER rescheduling hearing and briefing on # 15 Motion to Dismiss, and postponing filing of # 3 Status Report and Scheduling Conference by Safari Club International. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service) (Burdin, Douglas) Modified on 10/17/2014 (Marciel, M)
October 6, 2014 Filing 15 MOTION to DISMISS by Charlton H. Bonham, Kamala D. Harris. Motion Hearing set for 11/17/2014 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (GEB) before Judge Garland E. Burrell Jr.. (Attachments: # 1 Defendants' Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion to Dismiss; Declaration of Alexandra Robert Gordon, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Proposed Order, # 4 Proof of Service)(Gordon, Alexandra) Modified on 10/7/2014 (Becknal, R).
September 2, 2014 Filing 14 STIPULATION re Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Charlton H. Bonham, Kamala D. Harris. Attorney Gordon, Alexandra Robert added. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Gordon, Alexandra)
August 29, 2014 Filing 13 DECLINE to PROCEED BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Safari Club International. (Burdin, Douglas)
August 29, 2014 Filing 12 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED; Dept of Fish & Wildlife served on 8/18/14. (Burdin, Douglas) Modified on 9/2/2014 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
August 29, 2014 Filing 11 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Attorney General of California served on 8/18/2014. (Burdin, Douglas) Modified on 9/2/2014 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
August 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 8/28/14. Added Attorney Anna M. Seidman, PHV for Safari Club International. (Becknal, R)
August 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 8/28/14. Added Attorney Jeremy E. Clare, PHV for Safari Club International. (Becknal, R)
August 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 8/28/14. Added Attorney Douglas S. Burdin, PHV for Safari Club International. (Becknal, R)
August 8, 2014 Filing 7 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Safari Club International for attorney Jeremy E Clare to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0972-5459181) (Linton, Linda)
August 8, 2014 Filing 6 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Safari Club International for attorney Anna M Seidman to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0972-5459161) (Linton, Linda)
August 8, 2014 Filing 5 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Safari Club International for attorney Douglas S Burdin to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0972-5459131) (Linton, Linda)
August 7, 2014 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Charlton H. Bonham, Kamala D. Harris* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Linda J. Linton* *Linton & Associates, P.C.* *6900 S. McCarran Blvd., #2040* *Reno, NV 89509*. (Meuleman, A)
August 7, 2014 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 11/10/2014 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (GEB) before Judge Garland E. Burrell Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Consent Form, # 2 VDRP) (Meuleman, A)
August 6, 2014 Filing 2 COMPLAINT for Declarative and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants by Safari Club International. Attorney Linton, Linda Jeanne added. (Linton, Linda) Modified on 8/6/2014 (Meuleman, A).
August 6, 2014 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Safari Club International (Linton, Linda)
August 6, 2014 PAYMENT for Civil Case filing fee in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0972-5456265. (Linton, Linda)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Safari Club International v. Harris et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Safari Club International
Represented By: Linda Jeanne Linton
Represented By: Anna M. Seidman, PHV
Represented By: Jeremy E. Clare, PHV
Represented By: Douglas Scott Burdin, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charlton H. Bonham
Represented By: Alexandra Robert Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kamala D. Harris
Represented By: Alexandra Robert Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kamala Harris
Represented By: Alexandra Robert Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Humane Society of the United States
Represented By: Peter Alfred Brandt
Represented By: Hallie G Sears, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Fund for Animals
Represented By: Peter Alfred Brandt
Represented By: Hallie G Sears, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?