Reade v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Sherri A Reade
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2014cv01862
Filed: August 7, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 10 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS, recommending that action be dismissed for lack of prosecution, signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 12/2/2014. These Findings and Recommendations are SUBMITTED to District Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr.. Within 14 days after being served with these F/Rs, any party may file written Objections with Court and serve a copy on all parties. (Marciel, M)
October 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 10/29/14 ORDERING that the findings and recommendations filed 10/8/14 7 are vacated.No later than 11/21/14, plaintiff shall submit to the US Marshal a completed summons and copies of the com plaint, and to file a statement with the court that said documents had been submitted to the US Marshal; The Clerk of the Court is directed to serve a copy of this order on the United States Marshal. Plaintiff is reminded that under the scheduling order filed 8/18/14, plaintiff's motion for summary judgment and/or remand must be filed within 45 days after being served with a copy of the administrative record. Failure to comply with the scheduling order may result in a recommendation that the action be dismissed. (cc USM) (Becknal, R)
October 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 10/8/14 ORDERING that the Clerk assign a District Judge to this action. This case as been randomly assigned to District Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr.. Hencefor th, the new case number is 2:14-cv-01862 GEB CKD (SS) (PS). It is RECOMMENDED that this action be dismissed for lack of prosecution. This matter is referred to Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr.. Within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations, any party may file written objections with the court and serve a copy on all parties. (Kastilahn, A)
September 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 9/12/2014. Plaintiff shall, within 14 days from date of this Order, SHOW CAUSE why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. (Marciel, M)
August 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 8/18/14: Plaintiff's request to proceed in forma pauperis (ECF No. 2) is granted. The Clerk of the Court is directed to serve the undersigned's scheduling order in social security cases. The Clerk of the Court is further directed to serve a copy of this order on the United States Marshal. (cc:USM) (Kaminski, H)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reade v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherri A Reade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?