Carolina Casualty Insurance Company v. DC Transportation Services, Inc., et al
Plaintiff: Carolina Casualty Insurance Company
Defendant: DC Transportation Services, Inc., Igor Parfenov, Yevgeniy Nik Bugreyev and Andrey Pavlov
Case Number: 2:2014cv01889
Filed: August 11, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Presiding Judge: Garland E. Burrell
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 53 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr., on 8/18/15 ORDERING that the Status Conference is CONTINUED to 10/26/2015 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (GEB) before Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr.. A Joint Status Report shall be filed 14 days before the hearing. (Kastilahn, A)
July 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. on 7/9/2015 ORDERING 32 Plaintiff seeks leave under FRCP 15(a)(2) to file its "Proposed Second Amended Complaint", attached as an exhibit to its motion. [33-1]; the motion is unopposed and is GRANTED; Plaintiff has 7 days from the date on which this Order is filed to file the referenced Second Amended Complaint. (Reader, L)
June 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 6/3/15 GRANTING 30 Motion to Set Aside the Clerk of Court Entries of Default. (Meuleman, A)
January 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER CONTINUING STATUS (PRETRIAL SCHEDULING) CONFERENCE signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr., on January 22, 2015. The Scheduling Conference set for 01/26/2015 is CONTINUED TO 4/6/2015 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (GEB) before Judge Garland E. Bu rrell Jr. A joint status report shall be filed no later than fourteen (14) days prior to the Status Conference. Plaintiff shall take the steps necessary to prosecute this action as a default matter concerning Defendants DC Transportation Services, Inc.; Igor Parfenov, individually and dba DC Transport; and Yevgeniy Bugreyev no later than March 13, 2015. (Rivas, A)
November 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 11/20/2014 ORDERING the Status Conference CONTINUED to 1/26/2015 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (GEB) before Judge Garland E. Burrell Jr. Joint Status Report due no later than 14 days prior to the status conference. (Donati, J)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carolina Casualty Insurance Company v. DC Transportation Services, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolina Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Mark Eric Inbody
Represented By: Galina Kletser Jakobson
Represented By: Joel Andrew Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DC Transportation Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Igor Parfenov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yevgeniy Nik Bugreyev
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrey Pavlov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?