Crocker et al v. State of California, Department of Rehabilitation
Plaintiff: Gary Crocker and Thomas Evans
Defendant: State of California, Department of Rehabilitation
Case Number: 2:2014cv01944
Filed: August 20, 2014
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 551
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 1/6/15 DENYING AS MOOT 11 Motion for Preliminary Injunction and GRANTING 18 Motion to Dismiss. This case is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. CASE CLOSED. (Meuleman, A)
November 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATION and ORDER 22 continuing hearing date signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 11/18/2014. Motion Hearing is RE-SET for 1/8/2015 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE). Plaintiffs' Opposition to defendant's 18 Motion to Dismiss 1 Complaint remaining due on 11/20/2014 and defendant's Reply remaining due on 11/27/2014. (Marciel, M)
August 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEMORANDUM and ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 8/21/2014 DENYING 2 Motion for TRO without prejudice to refiling as a properly noticed Motion for a Preliminary Injunction in accordance with the FRCP and this Court's Local Rules. (Donati, J)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crocker et al v. State of California, Department of Rehabilitation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Crocker
Represented By: Timothy Ryan Elder
Represented By: Susan Rockwood Gashel, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Evans
Represented By: Timothy Ryan Elder
Represented By: Susan Rockwood Gashel, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of California, Department of Rehabilitation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?