Doxie v. McDonald et al
Plaintiff: Kenneth Doxie
Defendant: C. McDonald, A. Mann and E. Arnold
Case Number: 2:2014cv01977
Filed: August 25, 2014
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Solano
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 30 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 4/15/16 RECOMMENDING that this action be dismissed pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b). Referred to Judge William B. Shubb; Objections to F&R due within 14 days.(Dillon, M)
March 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 3/8/2016 ORDERING within 30 days, plaintiff shall file an opposition to the 27 motion for summary judgment or a statement of non-opposition. (Yin, K)
July 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 07/02/15 ordering the stay of discovery is lifted. The Discovery and Scheduling order 20 is partially vacated, in that the deadlines are reset as follows: ( Discovery due by 11/6/2015., All pretrial motions, except motions to compel discovery, shall be filed on or before 2/5/2016.) (Plummer, M)
June 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 6/2/2015 GRANTING defendant's 22 motion. Discovery is STAYED in this matter untli the court receives notification that plaintiff is able to participate in the discovery process. No later than 30 days from the date of this order, defendant shall file a stautus update on plaintiff's housing. (Yin, K)
February 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER ADOPTING 13 Findings and Recommendations signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 2/20/15. All defendants except C. McDonald are DISMISSED from this action with prejudice. (Meuleman, A)
November 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER AND FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 11/21/2014 ORDERING that service is appropriate for C. McDonald; the Clerk shall send plaintiff forms for service to be completed and returned within 30 days, along with the Notice of Submission; and the Clerk shall assign a district judge to this action; RECOMMENDING that all remaining defendants be dismissed from this action with prejudice. Assigned and Referred to District Judge William B. Shubb; Objections due within 14 days. (Yin, K)
September 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 9/26/14. Plaintiff's request for leave to proceed IFP is GRANTED. The statutory filing fee of $350.00 shall be collected in accordance with the concurrent order. The complaint is DISMISSED with leave to amend within 30 days. (Manzer, C)
September 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 09/02/14 ordering plaintiff shall submit within 30 days from the date of this order, a completed affidavit in support of his request to proceed in forma pauperis on the form provided by the clerk of the court. The clerk of the court is directed to send plaintiff a new application to proceed in forma pauperis by a prisoner. Plaintiff shall submit within 30 days from the date of this order, a certified copy of his prison trust account statement for the 6 month period immediately preceding the filing of the complaint. Plaintiff's motion for the appointment of counsel 3 is denied. (Plummer, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doxie v. McDonald et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Doxie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Mann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?