Perry-Dillard v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Susan Carol Perry-Dillard
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2014cv02025
Filed: September 2, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: El Dorado
Presiding Judge: Craig M. Kellison
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 3/15/2016 ORDERING that Plaintiff's 17 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED. Defendant's 20 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED. The Clerk of the Court is directed to enter judgment and close this file. CASE CLOSED. (Zignago, K.)
June 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 6/18/15 ORDERING that plaintiff may have an extension of time, to and including 5/28/15, in which to file Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment or Remand; Defendant may have an extension of time to 6/29/15 to file his opposition, if any is forthcoming. Any reply by plaintiff continues to be due 7/8/15. (Becknal, R)
April 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 4/16/15 ORDERING that plaintiff may have an extension of time, to and including May 19, 2015, in which to file Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment or Remand; Defendant may have an extension of time to June 18, 2015 to file his opposition, if any is forthcoming. Any reply by plaintiff continues to be due July 8, 2015.(Becknal, R)
February 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 2/6/15: Plaintiff may have an extension of time, to and including April 2, 2015, in which to file Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment or Remand; Defendant may have an extension of time to May 2, 2015 to file his opposition, if any is forthcoming. Any reply by plaintiff continues to be due May 22, 2015. (Kaminski, H)
September 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting plaintiff's 2 Motion to Proceed IFP, signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 9/4/14. The Clerk is directed to serve on plaintiff the undersigned's scheduling order in social security cases. The Clerk is further directed to serve a copy of this order on the United States Marshal (USM). Within 15 days from the date of this order, plaintiff shall submit to the USM a completed summons and copies of the complaint and file a statement with the court that said d ocuments have been submitted to the USM. The USM is directed to serve all process without prepayment of costs not later than 60 days from the date of this order. The USM shall also send a copy of the summons and complaint by registered or certified mail to the Commissioner of Social Security. (Kastilahn, A) Modified on 9/5/2014 (Kastilahn, A). (cc: USM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perry-Dillard v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Carol Perry-Dillard
Represented By: Steven Gilbert Rosales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Bobbie J. Montoya, ss
Represented By: Jennifer Lee Tarn, GOVT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?