Byrd v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Dorrance Byrd
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2014cv02036
Filed: September 2, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 29 STIPULATION and ORDER re attorney fees signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 12/29/15. (Kaminski, H)
September 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 9/28/2015 ORDERING that this action be REMANDED for further administrative action pursuant to section 205(g) of the Social Security Act, as amended, 42 U.S.C. section 405(g), sentence four and for entry of judgment. CASE CLOSED. (Zignago, K.)
August 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 8/28/15 ORDERING that the time for Defendant to file her response to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment is EXTENDED to 9/30/15. (Kastilahn, A)
July 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 7/30/15 ORDERING that the time for Defendant to file her response to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment should be EXTENDED from 7/27/15 to 8/31/15 8/31/2015. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
June 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 6/22/2015 ORDERING that plaintiff's time to file a motion for summary judgment is EXTENDED to 6/29/2015. (Zignago, K.)
February 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 2/19/2015 ORDERING that the time for defendant to file her response to plaintiff's complaint is EXTENDED from 2/23/2015 to 3/25/2015. (Zignago, K.)
October 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 10/29/2014 GRANTING 2 Motion to Proceed IFP. The Clerk is DIRECTED to issue process and new case documents. Within 14 days from the date of this order, plaintiff shall submit to the USM all necessary documents to effectuate service. (Donati, J)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Byrd v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorrance Byrd
Represented By: Jesse S. Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?