Rodriguez v. Penske Logistics, LLC
Plaintiff: Charles Rodriguez
Defendant: Penske Logistics, LLC
Case Number: 2:2014cv02061
Filed: September 5, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 05:704
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 1/17/2019 GRANTING 41 final approval of the settlement. The court AWARDS the class counsel attorney's fees of $265,000.00. The court AWARDS the class counsel reimbursement of costs in the amount of $900.69. The court AWARDS an incentive payment to Rodriguez of $3,000.00. The parties and the settlement administrator shall perform their respective obligations under the terms of the settlement agreement. In accordance with the parties' stipulation at hearing, the case is DISMISSED with prejudice.CASE CLOSED (Reader, L)
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 9/19/17 GRANTING preliminary certification of the class, GRANTING preliminary approval of the settlement, and GRANTING approval of the proposed notice to the putative class. The court APPOINTS C harles Rodriguez representative of the class and Desai Law Firm, P.C. as class counsel. The court modifies the parties' stipulated schedule, 36 , and ADOPTS the following schedule in this case:Deadline for Defendant to submit class list to C laims Administrator: 10/3/17; Deadline for Claims Administrator to mail Class Notice: 10/15/17; Deadline for Class Members to postmark Objections or Requests for Exclusiontimely Notice mailed: 11/14/17; Deadline for Class Members to postmark Objections or Requests for Exclusionremailed Notices: 11/27/17; Motion for Final Approval to be filed 12/29/17; Final Approval Hearing 1/26/18. (Becknal, R)
December 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER re 27 Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 12/27/16: In light of the court's questions raised at hearing, the court instructs plaintiff's counsel to submit a supplemental declaration. (Kaminski, H)
September 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 9/26/16 ORDERING that Plaintiff's and Defendant's counsel are hereby ordered to show cause on or before 10/3/16 why sanctions in the amount of $250 should not be imp osed against counsel for each party for their failure to comply with the court's order. If the case has not settled, the parties should submit a joint status report by 10/3/16 that includes all of the information required in a joint filing for a final pretrial conference. The Final Pretrial Conference date of 10/7/16 is confirmed.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
July 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 7/25/16: Final Pretrial Conference RESET for 10/7/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. The court VACATES the jury trial set for October 3, 2016. The parties shall file a joint status report on the progress of settlement negotiations no later than July 29, 2016. (Kaminski, H)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodriguez v. Penske Logistics, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Rodriguez
Represented By: Aashish Y. Desai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Penske Logistics, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?