McNeal v. Unknown
Plaintiff: Vernon McNeal
Defendant: Unknown
Case Number: 2:2014cv02121
Filed: September 12, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Imperial
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 5/14/2015 ORDERING that this civil rights action was closed on 3/19/2015. Plaintiff is advised that no orders will issue in response to future filings.(Yin, K)
March 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 3/18/15 ORDERING that this action is DISMISSED without prejudice. CASE CLOSED. (Dillon, M)
November 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 11/10/2014 GRANTING plaintiff's 6 filing, construed as a motion for an extension of time; plaintiff has 30 days to comply with the 9/23/2014 order; and the 5 order to show cause is DISCHARGED. (Yin, K)
October 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 10/29/14 ordering that plaintiff show cause, within 14 days why this action should not be dismissed without prejudice. (Plummer, M)
September 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 9/23/14 ORDERING that Plaintiffs September 12, 2014 letter is denied without prejudice; Plaintiff is granted thirty days from the date of service of this order to file a complaint or a petiti on that complies with the requirements. Clerk of the Court is directed to send plaintiff the courts form for filing a civil rights action, a petition for writ of habeas corpus, and the application to proceed in forma pauperis by a prisoner.(Dillon, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McNeal v. Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vernon McNeal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?