Lorenzana v. Thompson
Plaintiff: Adrian Lorenzana
Defendant: M. Thompson
Case Number: 2:2014cv02127
Filed: September 15, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Solano
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 11/16/2015 DISMISSING this action. CASE CLOSED. (Yin, K)
May 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 5/18/15 ORDERING the Sheriff of Solano County to collect and forward payment from the prison trust account of Adrian Lorenzana to the clerk until the balance of &# 036;350 is paid in full. The clerk is directed to serve a copy of this order and the plaintiff's IFP on the Sheriff of Solano County. The clerk is directed to serve a copy of this order on the financial department of the court. (cc Financial) (Dillon, M)
October 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 10/14/14 ORDERING that the Clerk of the Court shall send to Mr. Lorenzana the form complaint and application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis used in this court. Within 30 days of the date of this order, Mr. Lorenzana shall either pay the $400 filing fee or submit a complete application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis; and within 30 days of the date of this order, Mr. Lorenzana shall submit a complaint stating the nature of the action and his belief that he is entitled to redress. (Dillon, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lorenzana v. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adrian Lorenzana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?