Meixner v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Josh Meixner
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. and HSBC Bank USA, N.A.
Case Number: 2:2014cv02143
Filed: September 15, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Presiding Judge: Troy L. Nunley
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 11/19/19, per 73 Stipulation, CONTINUING the deadline for all Parties to submit and file the Pretrial Documents to 11/26/19; and the deadline to provide the Binder of Exhibits to the Court is CONTINUED to 11/26/19 at 3:00 p.m. (Benson, A.)
May 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 5/30/2018 CONTINUING deadline for expert discovery to 8/31/2018. (Zignago, K.)
April 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 48 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 4/19/2018 EXTENDING the deadline for the parties to complete expert discovery; Discovery due 5/31/2018. (Fabillaran, J)
March 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 3/12/2018 ORDERING following discovery deadlines: the Parties will exchange initial expert reports by 3/15/2018; Any rebuttal reports will be due on 3/22/2018; All expert depositions will be completed by 4/20/2018. (Washington, S)
April 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 4/18/2017 VACATING the Final Pretrial Conference Hearing set for 5/18/2017 and the Jury Trial set for 7/24/2017. ORDERING the parties to meet and confer if both are willing to attend a settlement confe rence before a magistrate judge and consent to the jurisdiction of the magistrate judge in order to have their trial concluded in a more timely matter. ORDERING the parties to file a joint statement within thirty (30) days of the entry of this Order notifying if a settlement conference would be beneficial. If the parties do not wish to attend a settlement conference or consent to the jurisdiction of the magistrate judge, the parties are hereby ordered to provide the Court with proposed trial dates in Spring 2018.(Washington, S)
February 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 2/6/2017 ORDERING The deadline for the parties to exchange initial Designation of Expert Witnesses reports is CONTINUED to 3/29/2017. (Washington, S)
December 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 12/8/2016 ORDERING that the date for completion of all non-expert discovery is CONTINUED to 1/31/2017. The deadline for initial designation of expert witnesses is CONTINUED to 1/31/2017. The deadline for dispositive motions is CONTINUED to 3/23/2017. (Zignago, K.)
June 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 6/13/2016 GRANTING 4 Motion to Dismiss 1 Complaint as to Counts VI, VII, and X. (Michel, G.)
May 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 5/19/2016 MODIFYING the 14 Pretrial Scheduling Order, 16 Order Modifying the Pretrial Scheduling Order; ORDERING that all non-expert discovery be completed by 12/31/2016; ORDERING t hat the initial designation of expert witnesses be completed by 12/31/2016; ORDERING that dispositive motions be heard by 2/23/2017; CONTINUING the Final Pretrial Conference to 5/18/2017 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley; CONTINUING the Jury Trial to 7/24/2017 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. (Michel, G.)
March 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER MODIFYING PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 03/07/15 ORDERING the date for completion of all non-expert discovery is continued to 6/30/16; Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 6/30/2016. (Jackson, T)
July 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 7/21/15: Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 4/28/2016. Discovery due by 2/29/2016. Dispositive Motions filed by 8/25/2016. Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/17/2016 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. Jury Trial set for 1/23/2017 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. (Kaminski, H)
April 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 4/23/2015 ORDERING 4 that Defendants' Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED in PART and DENIED in PART; Supplemental briefing limited to 10 pages to be filed with this Court within 30 days after the California Supreme Court issues its decision in Yvanova. (Reader, L)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Meixner v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Josh Meixner
Represented By: Danny A. Barak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Harold Ricky Jones, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC Bank USA, N.A.
Represented By: Harold Ricky Jones, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?