Correa v. Unknown
Petitioner: Victor Correa
Respondent: Warden at Corcoran
Case Number: 2:2014cv02160
Filed: September 17, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 4/13/2015 DENYING without prejudice petitioner's 25 request for appointment of counsel. (Yin, K)
March 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 22 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 3/24/2015 RECOMMENDING that respondent's 16 motion to dismiss be granted; petitioner's petition for writ of habeas corpus be dismissed as time-barred; and this case be closed. Referred to Judge John A. Mendez; Objections due within 14 days. (Yin, K)
February 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 02/19/15 ordering that petitioner file an opposition to respondent's pending motion to dismiss within 30 days or a statement of non-opposition. (Plummer, M)
September 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 9/23/2014 ORDERING petitioner to submit, within 30 days, an affidavit to proceed ifp or the appropriate filing fee; and the Clerk shall send petitioner an ifp form.(Yin, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Correa v. Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Victor Correa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden at Corcoran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?