Conservation Congress v. United States Forest Service
Plaintiff: Conservation Congress
Defendant: United States Forest Service
Case Number: 2:2014cv02228
Filed: September 25, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Presiding Judge: Garland E. Burrell
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 18:4208
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER denying 41 Motion to Stay and granting 52 Motion to Strike signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 5/29/15. (Kaminski, H)
May 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDE signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr., on 5/19/15 ORDERING that Plaintiff's request for an expedited briefing schedule is granted. Plaintiff may file a response to Defendant's "Motion to Strike," on or before 5/21/15, and Defendant may file a reply on or before 5/22/15. (Kastilahn, A)
May 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. on 05/14/15 GRANTING Franklin Logging, Inc.'s 48 Motion to Appear as Amicus Curiae. The amicus curiae brief and declaration are hereby filed. (Benson, A)
March 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 3/20/2015 GRANTING Defendant's 13 Motion for Summary Judgment and DENYING 14 & 20 Plaintiff's Motions for Summary Judgment. CASE CLOSED. (Donati, J)
January 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 1/21/15 GRANTING 21 Motion for Leave to File an Amicus Brief. (Meuleman, A)
January 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. on 1/5/2015 GRANTING 22 Joint Motion to Amend the 12 Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Order; AMENDING the 12 Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Order to reflect that briefs in opposition to summary judgment shall not exceed 25 pages. (Michel, G)
December 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 12/19/14 ORDERING that having reviewed Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File an Amended Memorandum in Support of Summary Judgment, the Court grants Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion.(Becknal, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Conservation Congress v. United States Forest Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conservation Congress
Represented By: Rachel Marie Fazio
Represented By: Sean T. Malone, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Forest Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?