Hutchinson v. California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation, et al.
Plaintiff: Knolts Hutchinson
Defendant: California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation, R. Rackley, B. Duffy, M. Kaplan, A. Romero and State of California
Case Number: 2:2014cv02398
Filed: October 13, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: San Joaquin
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: William B. Shubb
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 06/20/17 denying 53 Motion to Proceed IFP. The Clerk of the Court is directed to serve a copy of this order on the United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit, and plaintiff is hereby informed that he may file a motion to proceed in forma pauperis in the United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit. (cc: USCA, 9th Circuit) (Plummer, M)
May 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 49 MEMORANDUM and ORDER granting 39 Motion for Summary Judgment signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 5/16/17. CASE CLOSED. (Kaminski, H)
March 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 3/24/2015 GRANTING 20 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff shall have 21 days from the date of this order to file an amended complaint in a manner consistent with this order. (Donati, J)
February 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 29 NON-RELATED CASE 25 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 2/24/2015. Court has determined it is inappropriate to relate or reassign these cases and therefore DECLINES to do so. This Order is issued for informational purposes only, and shall have no effect on status of the cases, including any previous Related (or Non-Related) Case Order of this Court.(Marciel, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hutchinson v. California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Rackley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. Duffy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Romero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Knolts Hutchinson
Represented By: Scottlynn J. Hubbard, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?