Johnson v. Tran
Plaintiff: Scott Johnson
Defendant: Hung Thanh Tran
Case Number: 2:2014cv02437
Filed: October 17, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: William B. Shubb
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 7/10/15: This action is hereby ordered dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear their own attorneys' fees and costs. (Kaminski, H)
June 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 6/1/15. All currently set dates are hereby VACATED. Joint Stipulation for Dismissal due no later than 7/31/15, or a Joint Status Report if settlement had not been finalized. Status Conference set for 8/17/2015 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Manzer, C)
February 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STATUS (PRETRIAL SCHEDULING) ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 2/11/15 ORDERING that the 2/17/15 Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Conference is VACATED. Initial disclosures are due by 2/23/2015. Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 4/27/2015 and any rebuttal disclosures due by 5/26/2015. All Discovery shall be completed by 6/29/2015. All motions to compel discovery must be heard by the magistrate judge not later than 6/29/2015. All Motions except motions for continuances, t emporary restraining orders, or other emergency applications, shall be filed by 8/17/2015. The Final Pretrial Conference is SET for 10/26/2015 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. The Bench Trial is SET for 12/8/2015 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. The parties shall contact the assigned Magistrate Judge's courtroom deputy no later than 3/23/2015, to schedule an early settlement conference. (Kastilahn, A)
January 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 1/12/15: The deadline for Hung Thanh Tran to file a responsive pleading shall be extended by two weeks to January 23, 2015.(Kaminski, H)
December 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STIPULATION and ORDER 7 for extension of time signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 12/30/2014. Defendant Hung Thanh Tran shall file responsive pleading by 1/10/2015. (Marciel, M)
November 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 11/25/14. Defendant Hung Thanh Tran shall file a responsive pleading by 12/25/14. (Manzer, C)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Tran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Johnson
Represented By: Phyl Grace
Represented By: Mark D. Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hung Thanh Tran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?