Bui v. Sprint Corporation, et al
Plaintiff: Viet Bui
Defendant: Sprint Corporation and Sprint/United Management Co.
Case Number: 2:2014cv02461
Filed: October 17, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Presiding Judge: Troy L. Nunley
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 73 FINAL ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 7/19/2016 GRANTING Plaintiff's 71 Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and GRANTING Plaintiff's 64 Motion for Attorney Fees. CASE CLOSED. (Jackson, T)
March 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 62 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 3/7/16 ORDERING that the Amended Class Notice provided at Exhibit A to the Joint Stipulation is approved for sending to the putative Class Members in accordance with the below Implementation Schedule; and the following Implementation Schedule shall be followed by the parties and the Settlement administrator for conducting the Settlement administration and for taking this action through the Final Approval hearing on June 16, 2016. (Becknal, R)
February 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 2/23/2016 GRANTING 39 Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement. (Zignago, K.)
June 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 6/19/15 DENYING 48 Motion to Intervene; DENYING 15 Motion to Intervene. Proposed Intervenors do not satisfy the requirements of FRCP 25(a) for intervention by right, and the Court does not find permitted intervention under FRCP 24(b). (Meuleman, A)
May 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 5/22/15 GRANTING leave to file a second amended complaint. Plaintiff my file a second amended complaint in the form attached as Exhibit 1 to the parties' joint stipulation; defendants shall not be required to file a response. (Manzer, C)
May 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 5/11/15 ORDERING that Plaintiff may file a Memorandum of Points and Authorities in support of Plaintiff's Motion that is up to twenty-five (25) pages in length, exclusive of indexes, exhibits, a table of contents, a table of authorities, and other preliminary matters. (Becknal, R)
March 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 3/6/2015 DENYING 28 Ex Parte Application to Stay Mediation. (Michel, G.)
February 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER Concerning Discovery and Confidential Information signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 2/26/15. (Kastilahn, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bui v. Sprint Corporation, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Viet Bui
Represented By: Richard E. Quintilone, II, NCAED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sprint Corporation
Represented By: Harold M. Brody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sprint/United Management Co.
Represented By: Harold M. Brody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?