Estate of Jayne Bonham v. Burwell
Plaintiff: Estate of Jayne Bonham
Defendant: Sylvia Mathews Burwell
Case Number: 2:2014cv02465
Filed: October 20, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 3/10/17 ORDERING that Plaintiff's 24 motion for summary judgment is DENIED. The final decision of the Secretary is AFFIRMED. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment for the defendant. CASE CLOSED (Kastilahn, A)
March 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 03/30/16 ORDERING that plaintiff's motion for summary judgment and/or remand is due 05/16/16; the Secretary's opposition and/or cross-motion for summary judgment is due 06/27/16 and plaintiff's reply is due 07/18/16. Plaintiff is invited to re-submit his request for a status conference, if it briefly sets forth the reason such a conference would be helpful to adjudication of this case. (Benson, A)
February 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 2/26/2016 ORDERING no later than 30 days from the date of this order, the parties shall; (A) Complete and return the "Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge" or "Request for Reassignment to a U.S. District Judge" served on them with the Scheduling Order. See ECF No. 4-2.; (B) file a Joint Status Report setting forth proposed dates for commencing and completing briefing in this matter, advising the court whether ora l argument is requested or not, and advising the court of any other relevant matter; if the parties fail to agree on a Joint Status Report, they shall file separate Status Reports; if any party believes that a Status Conference would be helpful in managing this case, that party may request it in the Status Report. (Reader, L)
March 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SECOND STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 3/25/2015 ORDERING that Defendant shall have until 5/6/2015 to file the Administrative Record and a responsive pleading. (Reader, L)
February 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 8 REVISED STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 2/12/2015 ORDERING 7 that defendant shall have until 3/26/2015 to file the Administrative Record and a responsive pleading. (Reader, L)
January 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STIPULATION and ORDER 5 for extension of time signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 1/22/2015. Court is DENYING, without prejudice, parties' Request for Extension. (Marciel, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Estate of Jayne Bonham v. Burwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Jayne Bonham
Represented By: William E. Bonham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sylvia Mathews Burwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?