Schmidt et al v. Shasta County Marshal's Office et al

Plaintiff: Jaime Schmidt, Debra Knowles, Elizabeth Sampson and Ryan Henrioulle
Defendant: Shasta County Marshal's Office and Joel Dean
Case Number: 2:2014cv02471
Filed: October 21, 2014
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000 Job Discrimination (Sex)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 13, 2017 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 09/12/17 DENYING defendant's 64 Motion for Reconsideration. (Benson, A.)
June 20, 2017 62 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 6/16/17 ORDERING that Plaintiffs' Motion for Reconsideration, 51 , is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. It is GRANTED as to the Schmidt's retaliation claims, but DENIED as to the remainder of Plaintiffs' claims. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
February 21, 2017 48 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 2/21/17 ORDERING for the reasons provided above, Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, ECF No. 25 , is GRANTED. The matter having now been concluded in its entirety, the Clerk of Court is directed to close the file. CASE CLOSED. (Becknal, R)
October 21, 2016 42 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 10/19/2016 ORDERING that the Hearing on the Defendants' 25 Motion for Summary Judgment is CONTINUED to 12/1/2016 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before District Judge Morrison C. England Jr. (Jackson, T)
October 7, 2016 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 10/5/2016 GRANTING 34 Motion for Leave to File Late Opposition. Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment, if any, shall be due to be filed no later than 10/7/2016. Defendants' Reply shall be filed not later than 11/10/2016. The 10/20/2016, hearing on Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment is VACATED and CONTINUED to 11/17/2016, at 2:00p.m. in Courtroom 7. (Zignago, K.)
June 30, 2016 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., on 6/29/16 ORDERING that Defendants' 19 ex parte application is GRANTED in part.The parties may file memoranda in support of (and in opposition to) a single motion for summary judgme nt in excess of the page limits set forth in the Court's Pretrial Scheduling Order. In particular, Defendants may file an opening memorandum not to exceed 50 pages and a reply memorandum, not to exceed 20 pages. Plaintiffs may file an opposition memorandum not to exceed 50 pages. (Kastilahn, A)
December 2, 2015 16 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE PRETRIAL DEADLINES signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 12/1/15 ORDERING Disclosure of Expert Witnesses due by 6/23/16; Discovery deadline by 4/22/16; Dispositive Motions due by 10/20/16 ; Non-Dispositive Motions due by 1/19/17; Joint Final Pretrial Conference Statements due by 1/19/17; Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/9/17 at 02:00; Jury Trial set for 4/3/17 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Chief Judge Morrison C. England Jr; Settlement conference statements due 5/12/16; Settlement Conference set for 5/19/16 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 26 (AC) before Magistrate Judge Allison Claire. (Becknal, R)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schmidt et al v. Shasta County Marshal's Office et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaime Schmidt
Represented By: Anthony J. Poidmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Knowles
Represented By: Anthony J. Poidmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Sampson
Represented By: Anthony J. Poidmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Henrioulle
Represented By: Anthony J. Poidmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shasta County Marshal's Office
Represented By: Timothy G. Yeung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joel Dean
Represented By: Timothy G. Yeung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?