DirectTV, LLC v. Scott
Plaintiff: DirectTV, LLC
Defendant: John W. Scott
Case Number: 2:2014cv02563
Filed: November 3, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 26 DEFAULT JUDGMENT against John W. Scott pursuant to order signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 10/15/2015. (Zignago, K.)
August 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 8/3/15 ORDERING that plaintiff shall forthwith serve a copy of this order and findings and recommendations on defendant by U.S. mail at defendant's last-known address, and file a proof of service; RECOMMENDING that 20 Motion for Default Judgment be granted in part; judgment be entered in plaintiff's favor and against defendant; plaintiff be awarded a total of $4,000.00 in statutory damages; plaintiff be awarded attorneys' fees and costs in the amount of $4,446.50; and that the Clerk of Court be directed to close this case. Referred to Judge John A. Mendez; Objections to F&R due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Meuleman, A)
May 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 5/15/2015 ORDERING that the Clerk of Court shall enter defendant's default. Within 28 days of the Clerk of Court's entry of default, plaintiff shall move for default judgment. That motion shall be noticed before the undersigned in accordance with Local Rule 230. (Zignago, K.)
April 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 4/17/15 ORDERING that Defendant's purported answer 5 is STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure; Within 21 days of this order, defendant shall file an am ended answer that complies with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure; Failure to file an amended answer by the required deadline OR failure to file an amended answer that complies with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure will result in an order st riking that pleading and directing the Clerk to enter defendant's default, whereupon plaintiff will be permitted to move for a default judgment; Defendant is cautioned that future failure to comply with any court order, the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, or this court's Local Rules may result in the imposition of any appropriate sanctions. (Becknal, R)
January 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 1/26/15: Status (pre-trial scheduling) conference set for 4/16/2015 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 25 (KJN) before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman. Not later than fourteen (14) days prior to the status conference, the parties shall meet and confer, and file a joint status report. (Kaminski, H)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DirectTV, LLC v. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John W. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DirectTV, LLC
Represented By: Yasha Bronshteyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?